Canadian Transit Heritage Foundation (Corporation# 2826330) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is June 3, 1992.
Corporation ID | 2826330 |
Business Number | 891343949 |
Corporation Name |
Canadian Transit Heritage Foundation Fondation canadienne du patrimoine du transport urbain |
Registered Office Address |
260 Adelaide Street East P.o. Box: 30 Toronto ON M5A 1N1 |
Incorporation Date | 1992-06-03 |
Corporation Status | Active / Actif |
Number of Directors | 5 - 25 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
PETER CHATOFF | 4336 POLTAVA CRES., MISSISSAUGA ON L4W 3C2, Canada |
David Stowe | 151 Harvest Drive, Milton ON L9T 4T2, Canada |
Patrick Delmore | 885 Front Road North, Amherstburg ON N9V 2V6, Canada |
Alex Regiec | 1203 - 1 Evergreen Place, Winnipeg MB R3L 0E9, Canada |
ADAM ZHELKA | 22 OMAHA AVENUE, TORONTO ON M5J 1Z8, Canada |
Robert Hussey | 130 Willis Avenue, Medford MA 02155, United States |
Dave Reage | 296 Colby Drive, Dartmouth NS B2V 2B6, Canada |
CHRIS PRENTICE | 19 FINTONA AVENUE, TORONTO ON M1E 1V4, Canada |
Robert Lubinski | 1460 Derby County Crescent, Oakville ON L6M 4N9, Canada |
Ashton Wong | 165 Cy Becker Boulevard Northwest, Edmonton AB T5Y 6M1, Canada |
KEVIN NICOL | 146-11 QUEENSLEA DRIVE, HAMILTON ON L8W 1T7, Canada |
Keith Littlewood | 14 Dawson Crescent, Brampton ON L6V 3M5, Canada |
Wes Woods | 1088 De L'Illusion, Quebec City QC G3K 2H6, Canada |
Douglas Shields | 2139 Nightingale Way, Oakville ON L6M 3R9, Canada |
Robert Chew | 6210 Commercial Street, Vancouver BC V5P 3P3, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 2014-09-19 | current |
Canada Not-for-profit Corporations Act (NFP Act) Loi canadienne sur les organisations Г but non lucratif (Loi BNL) |
Act | 1992-06-03 | 2014-09-19 |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Act | 1992-06-02 | 1992-06-03 |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Address | 2014-10-01 | current | 260 Adelaide Street East, P.o. Box: 30, Toronto, ON M5A 1N1 |
Address | 2014-09-19 | 2014-10-01 | 19 Fintona Avenue, Toronto, ON M1E 1V4 |
Address | 2007-03-31 | 2014-10-01 | 55 York Street, Suite 901, Toronto, ON M5J 1R7 |
Address | 1992-06-03 | 2007-03-31 | 55 York Street, Suite 901, Toronto, ON M5J 1R7 |
Name | 2014-09-19 | current | Canadian Transit Heritage Foundation |
Name | 2014-09-19 | current | Fondation canadienne du patrimoine du transport urbain |
Name | 1992-06-03 | 2014-09-19 | FONDATION CANADIENNE DU PATRIMOINE DU TRANSPORT URBAIN |
Name | 1992-06-03 | 2014-09-19 | CANADIAN TRANSIT HERITAGE FOUNDATION |
Status | 2014-09-19 | current | Active / Actif |
Status | 1992-06-03 | 2014-09-19 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2014-09-19 | Continuance (transition) / Prorogation (transition) | Jurisdiction: Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA-II) / Loi sur les corporations canadiennes, partie 2 (LCC-Partie 2) |
1992-06-03 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2020 | 2020-09-26 | Non-Soliciting N'ayant pas recours Г la sollicitation |
2019 | 2019-06-15 | Non-Soliciting N'ayant pas recours Г la sollicitation |
2018 | 2018-06-09 | Non-Soliciting N'ayant pas recours Г la sollicitation |
2017 | 2017-06-17 | Non-Soliciting N'ayant pas recours Г la sollicitation |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
8636508 Canada Inc. | 260 Adelaide Street East, Suite 82, Toronto, ON M5A 1N1 | 2013-09-16 |
Urbanik Studio Inc. | 260 Adelaide Street East, Suite 154, Toronto, ON M5A 1N1 | 2015-07-07 |
Open Ip Corporation | 260 Adelaide Street East, Unit 71, Toronto, ON M5A 1N1 | 2016-05-05 |
Litarium Group Ltd. | 260 Adelaide Street East, Suite 220, Toronto, ON M5A 1N1 | 2017-07-26 |
Merkle [42] Corporation | 260 Adelaide Street East, Suite #28, Toronto, ON M5A 1N1 | 2018-12-13 |
Global Association for Pku | 260 Adelaide Street East, Suite 180, Toronto, ON M5A 1N1 | 2019-03-22 |
Xps Enterprises, Inc. | 260 Adelaide Street East, #163, Toronto, ON M5A 1N1 | 2019-05-25 |
Old York Publishing, Inc. | 260 Adelaide Street East, Suite 175, Toronto, ON M5A 1N1 | 2019-11-25 |
Archer Perry Inc. | 260 Adelaide Street East, Suite 220, Toronto, ON M5A 1N1 | 2020-06-17 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Caper & Co Inc. | 200 - 258 Adelaide St East, Toronto, ON M5A 1N1 | 2020-07-01 |
Global Alliance of Sickle Cell Disease Organizations (gascdo) | 260 Adelaide St E, Unit 127, Toronto, ON M5A 1N1 | 2019-10-21 |
Roustan Media Ltd. | 264 Adelaide Street, Suite B01, Toronto, ON M5A 1N1 | 2017-08-21 |
Mint Room Studios Incorporated | 200 - 258 Adelaide Street East, C/o Purple Tree Photography, Toronto, ON M5A 1N1 | 2017-05-22 |
Meftih Services Incorporated | 260 Adelaide St. E, #192, Toronto, ON M5A 1N1 | 2015-01-02 |
Myplanet International Ltd. | 252 Adelaide Street East, Toronto, ON M5A 1N1 | 2013-06-12 |
Purple Tree Photography Inc. | 200-258 Adelaide Street East, Toronto, ON M5A 1N1 | 2012-08-25 |
Maw Holding Company, Inc. | 163-260 Adelaide St. E, Toronto, ON M5A 1N1 | 2009-08-31 |
Sickle Cell Disease Association of Canada | Unit 34, 260 Adelaide St. E., Toronto, ON M5A 1N1 | 2008-08-05 |
Canadian Pku and Allied Disorders Inc. | Suite 180-260 Adelaide Street East, Toronto, ON M5A 1N1 | 2008-02-26 |
Find all corporations in postal code M5A 1N1 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
PETER CHATOFF | 4336 POLTAVA CRES., MISSISSAUGA ON L4W 3C2, Canada |
David Stowe | 151 Harvest Drive, Milton ON L9T 4T2, Canada |
Patrick Delmore | 885 Front Road North, Amherstburg ON N9V 2V6, Canada |
Alex Regiec | 1203 - 1 Evergreen Place, Winnipeg MB R3L 0E9, Canada |
ADAM ZHELKA | 22 OMAHA AVENUE, TORONTO ON M5J 1Z8, Canada |
Robert Hussey | 130 Willis Avenue, Medford MA 02155, United States |
Dave Reage | 296 Colby Drive, Dartmouth NS B2V 2B6, Canada |
CHRIS PRENTICE | 19 FINTONA AVENUE, TORONTO ON M1E 1V4, Canada |
Robert Lubinski | 1460 Derby County Crescent, Oakville ON L6M 4N9, Canada |
Ashton Wong | 165 Cy Becker Boulevard Northwest, Edmonton AB T5Y 6M1, Canada |
KEVIN NICOL | 146-11 QUEENSLEA DRIVE, HAMILTON ON L8W 1T7, Canada |
Keith Littlewood | 14 Dawson Crescent, Brampton ON L6V 3M5, Canada |
Wes Woods | 1088 De L'Illusion, Quebec City QC G3K 2H6, Canada |
Douglas Shields | 2139 Nightingale Way, Oakville ON L6M 3R9, Canada |
Robert Chew | 6210 Commercial Street, Vancouver BC V5P 3P3, Canada |
City | TORONTO |
Post Code | M5A 1N1 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Fondation Du Patrimoine De L'infanterie Canadienne | 2089 Delmar Drive, Ottawa, ON K1H 5P6 | 1991-11-29 |
Fondation Du Jardin Du Patrimoine Canadien | 90 Sparks Street, Suite 518, Ottawa, ON K1P 5T6 | 1995-02-14 |
Canadian Motorsport Heritage Foundation | 151 Yonge Street, Suite 1500, Toronto, ON M5C 2W7 | 2009-06-03 |
La Fondation De L'heritage Indo-canadienne | 27 Lakeview Road, Baie D'urfe, QC H9X 3A9 | 1994-10-04 |
Canadian Urban Transit Association | 55, York Street, Suite 1401, Toronto, ON M5J 1R7 | 1973-11-16 |
Foundation for French America Heritage | 4625 Avenue Christophe Colomb, Montreal, QC H2J 3G7 | 1994-04-07 |
La Fondation Du Patrimoine St. Patrick | 1145 De Salaberry, Quebec, QC G1R 2V6 | 1987-12-11 |
Canadian Automobile Heritage Society | 200-290 Boul. Saint-joseph, Gatineau, QC J8Y 3Y3 | 2014-11-24 |
Canadian Association of Heritage Professionals | 190 Bronson Avenue, Ottawa, ON K1N 8A8 | 1988-05-18 |
Canadian Communication Heritage Society | 200-209 Boul. Saint-joseph, Gatineau, QC J8Y 3Y3 | 2014-12-05 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on Canadian Transit Heritage Foundation.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.