LA COMMISSION CANADIENNE DE MISE EN VALEUR DE LA MAIN-D'OEUVRE (Corporation# 2728958) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is June 25, 1991.
Corporation ID | 2728958 |
Business Number | 129879441 |
Corporation Name |
LA COMMISSION CANADIENNE DE MISE EN VALEUR DE LA MAIN-D'OEUVRE CANADIAN LABOUR FORCE DEVELOPMENT BOARD |
Registered Office Address |
66 Slater Street 1204 Box 24021 Ottawa ON K1P 5H1 |
Incorporation Date | 1991-06-25 |
Dissolution Date | 2001-10-08 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 37 - 37 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
ROGER HUDSON | 1908 COLONEL SAM DR, OSHAWA ON L1H 8P7, Canada |
LES HOLLOWAY | 2000 BARRINGTON STREET, SUITE 1306, HALIFAX NS B3J 3K1, Canada |
ROBERT NOTMAN | 80 ELGIN STREET, SUITE 201, OTTAWA ON K1P 6R2, Canada |
DEBBY SMITH | 2220 COLLEVE AVE, 5TH FLOOR, REGINA SK S4P 3V7, Canada |
GAIL THOMAS | STN PROV GOVT, BOX 9882, VICTORIA BC V8W 9T6, Canada |
ANNE FRASER | BOX 668, DARTHMOUTH NS B2Y 3Y9, Canada |
VINAY DEY | 356 MADDOCK CRECENT NE, CALGARY AB T2A 3W9, Canada |
THOMAS REID | 234 EGLINTON AVENUE E., 7TH FLOOR, TORONTO ON M4P 1K7, Canada |
MARIAN MEAGHER | 2994 DOUGLAS ST, SUITE 301, VICTORIA BC V8T 4N4, Canada |
EDNA TURPIN-DOWNEY | PRINCE PHILLIP DR., BOX 1693, ST. JOHN'S NL A1C 5P7, Canada |
LEAH GOODWIN | 185 CARLTON STREET, SUITE 407, WINNIPEG MB R3C 3J1, Canada |
MARK CLEVELAND | 4605 FRANKLIN AVENUE, YELLOWKNIFE NT X1A 2L9, Canada |
DAVE EASBY | 470 YORK STREET, FREDERICTON NB E3B 5H1, Canada |
DEBBIE PINEAU | -, BOX 2000, CHARLETETOWN PE C1A 7N8, Canada |
WAYNE DOGGETT | BOX 578, HALIFAX NS B3J 2S9, Canada |
JOE MALONEY | 350 SPARKS STREET, SUITE 910, OTTAWA ON K1R 7S8, Canada |
BRIAN SCROGGS | 2925 DOULGAS STREET, VICTORIA BC V8T 4M8, Canada |
RAY MCISAAC | 35 CAROLINA AVE, STEPHENVILLE NL A2N 3P8, Canada |
BRUCE BALDWIN | 900 BAY STREET, 18TH FLLOR, QUEEN'S PARK, TORONTO ON M7Z 1L2, Canada |
CLAIRE MORRIS | 140 PROMENADE DU PORTAGE, PHASE 1V 13TH FL, HULL QC K1A 0J9, Canada |
DEBORAH MARR | 160 ELGIN STREET, ROOM 805, OTTAWA ON K1G 3J4, Canada |
PETER DOYLE | 140 PROMENADE DU PORTAGE, PH.IV, HULL QC K1A 0J9, Canada |
JANET DASSINGER | 2841 RIVERSIDE DRIVE, OTTAWA ON K1V 8X7, Canada |
ALISON EARLE | -, P O BOX 8700, ST-JOHN NL A1B 4J6, Canada |
FERNAND BOUDREAU | 140 PROMENADE DU PORTAGE, PH. IV, HULL QC K1A 0J9, Canada |
GORDON MCDEVITT | BOX 2703, WHITEHORSE YT Y1A 2C6, Canada |
DONNA FINKLEMAN | 201 WATSON ST, SUITE 101, WINNIPEG MB R2P 2E1, Canada |
JOANNE LINDSAY | BOX 92511, 152 CARLTON STREET, TORONTO ON M5A 4N9, Canada |
PAUL INKSETTER | 60 MOBILE DE, TORONTO ON M4A 2P3, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1991-06-25 | current |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Act | 1991-06-24 | 1991-06-25 |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Address | 1991-06-25 | current | 66 Slater Street, 1204 Box 24021, Ottawa, ON K1P 5H1 |
Name | 1991-06-25 | current | LA COMMISSION CANADIENNE DE MISE EN VALEUR DE LA MAIN-D'OEUVRE |
Name | 1991-06-25 | current | CANADIAN LABOUR FORCE DEVELOPMENT BOARD |
Status | 2001-10-08 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1991-06-25 | 2001-10-08 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2001-10-08 | Dissolution | Section: Part II of CCA / Partie II de la LCC |
1991-06-25 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
1999 | 1998-07-09 | |
1998 | 1996-07-04 | |
1997 | 1996-07-04 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Comstat Research Associates Ltd. | 66 Slater Street, 17th Floor, Ottawa, ON | 1979-10-26 |
Xarca Corporation | 66 Slater Street, Suite 1901, Ottawa, ON K1P 5H1 | 1999-02-23 |
I.g.t. Glassware Limited | 66 Slater Street, Suite 1900, Ottawa, ON K1P 5H1 | 1983-12-21 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
3446603 Canada, Inc. | 66 Slter Street, Suite 2300, Ottawa, ON K1P 5H1 | 1997-12-16 |
3222624 Canada Inc. | 66 Slater St., Ottawa, ON K1P 5H1 | 1996-01-26 |
2961253 Canada Inc. | 66 Slater St, 19th Floor, Ottawa, ON K1P 5H1 | 1993-10-07 |
3446603 Canada, Inc. | 66 Slater, 23rd Floor, Ottawa, ON K1P 5H1 | |
3222624 Canada, Inc. | 66 Slater Street, 23rd Floor, Ottawa, ON K1P 5H1 | |
Science Focus/objectif Science | 66 Slater St., Room P-13, Ottawa, ON K1P 5H1 | 1980-07-31 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
11617141 Canada Inc. | 1607 - 324 Laurier Ave W, Ottawa, ON K1P 0A4 | 2019-09-10 |
Askella Advisory Inc. | 1905 - 324 Laurier Avenue West, Ottawa, ON K1P 0A4 | 2019-01-03 |
10970298 Canada Inc. | 2106-324 Laurier Avenue West, Ottawa, ON K1P 0A4 | 2018-08-30 |
Flux Products Inc. | 324 Laurier Ave West, Unit 2308, Ottawa, ON K1P 0A4 | 2016-02-04 |
9469630 Canada Inc. | 1210-324 Laurier Avenue West, Ottawa, ON K1P 0A4 | 2015-10-08 |
9051503 Canada Inc. | 2110-324 Laurier Avenue West, Ottawa, ON K1P 0A4 | 2014-10-15 |
Readiness Options Consulting, Inc. | 1208-324 Laurier Ave W, Ottawa, ON K1P 0A4 | 2012-09-24 |
Fresh Founders | 709-324 Laurier Avenue West, Ottawa, ON K1P 0A4 | 2012-06-12 |
8047944 Canada Inc. | 324 Laurier Avenue, #2309, Ottawa, ON K1P 0A4 | 2011-12-07 |
Carol A. Frere-leveille Consulting Ltd. | 2301-324 Laurier Avenue West, Ottawa, ON K1P 0A4 | 2010-04-08 |
Find all corporations in postal code K1P |
Name | Address |
---|---|
ROGER HUDSON | 1908 COLONEL SAM DR, OSHAWA ON L1H 8P7, Canada |
LES HOLLOWAY | 2000 BARRINGTON STREET, SUITE 1306, HALIFAX NS B3J 3K1, Canada |
ROBERT NOTMAN | 80 ELGIN STREET, SUITE 201, OTTAWA ON K1P 6R2, Canada |
DEBBY SMITH | 2220 COLLEVE AVE, 5TH FLOOR, REGINA SK S4P 3V7, Canada |
GAIL THOMAS | STN PROV GOVT, BOX 9882, VICTORIA BC V8W 9T6, Canada |
ANNE FRASER | BOX 668, DARTHMOUTH NS B2Y 3Y9, Canada |
VINAY DEY | 356 MADDOCK CRECENT NE, CALGARY AB T2A 3W9, Canada |
THOMAS REID | 234 EGLINTON AVENUE E., 7TH FLOOR, TORONTO ON M4P 1K7, Canada |
MARIAN MEAGHER | 2994 DOUGLAS ST, SUITE 301, VICTORIA BC V8T 4N4, Canada |
EDNA TURPIN-DOWNEY | PRINCE PHILLIP DR., BOX 1693, ST. JOHN'S NL A1C 5P7, Canada |
LEAH GOODWIN | 185 CARLTON STREET, SUITE 407, WINNIPEG MB R3C 3J1, Canada |
MARK CLEVELAND | 4605 FRANKLIN AVENUE, YELLOWKNIFE NT X1A 2L9, Canada |
DAVE EASBY | 470 YORK STREET, FREDERICTON NB E3B 5H1, Canada |
DEBBIE PINEAU | -, BOX 2000, CHARLETETOWN PE C1A 7N8, Canada |
WAYNE DOGGETT | BOX 578, HALIFAX NS B3J 2S9, Canada |
JOE MALONEY | 350 SPARKS STREET, SUITE 910, OTTAWA ON K1R 7S8, Canada |
BRIAN SCROGGS | 2925 DOULGAS STREET, VICTORIA BC V8T 4M8, Canada |
RAY MCISAAC | 35 CAROLINA AVE, STEPHENVILLE NL A2N 3P8, Canada |
BRUCE BALDWIN | 900 BAY STREET, 18TH FLLOR, QUEEN'S PARK, TORONTO ON M7Z 1L2, Canada |
CLAIRE MORRIS | 140 PROMENADE DU PORTAGE, PHASE 1V 13TH FL, HULL QC K1A 0J9, Canada |
DEBORAH MARR | 160 ELGIN STREET, ROOM 805, OTTAWA ON K1G 3J4, Canada |
PETER DOYLE | 140 PROMENADE DU PORTAGE, PH.IV, HULL QC K1A 0J9, Canada |
JANET DASSINGER | 2841 RIVERSIDE DRIVE, OTTAWA ON K1V 8X7, Canada |
ALISON EARLE | -, P O BOX 8700, ST-JOHN NL A1B 4J6, Canada |
FERNAND BOUDREAU | 140 PROMENADE DU PORTAGE, PH. IV, HULL QC K1A 0J9, Canada |
GORDON MCDEVITT | BOX 2703, WHITEHORSE YT Y1A 2C6, Canada |
DONNA FINKLEMAN | 201 WATSON ST, SUITE 101, WINNIPEG MB R2P 2E1, Canada |
JOANNE LINDSAY | BOX 92511, 152 CARLTON STREET, TORONTO ON M5A 4N9, Canada |
PAUL INKSETTER | 60 MOBILE DE, TORONTO ON M4A 2P3, Canada |
City | OTTAWA |
Post Code | K1P5H1 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Conseil National Sur Le Developpement De La Main-d'oeuvre Des Minorites Visibles (cndmmv) | 396 Cooper St, Suite 422, Ottawa, ON K2P 2H7 | 1997-04-21 |
West End Labour Supply Inc. | 6600 Route Trans Canadienne, Suite 750, Pointe-claire, QC | 1980-10-17 |
The Canadian Board of Occupational Medicine | 503-386 Broadway, Winnipeg, MB R3C 3R6 | 1980-10-16 |
Canadian Health Policy Implementation Initiative | 40 King Street West, #4200, Toronto, ON M5H 3Y4 | 2006-06-19 |
Le Conseil Pour La Mise En Valeur Des Ressources Secondaires | 615 De Montmartre St., Quebec, QC G1N 1B3 | 1980-05-15 |
Commission Canadienne De Recherche Sur La Construction | 100 Sparks Street, Suite 1000, Ottawa, ON K1P 5B7 | 1996-11-01 |
New Congo Resources Development Company Inc. | 601 - 80 Richmond Street West, Toronto, ON M5H 2A4 | |
Aboriginal Labour Force Development Circle Inc. | 14 York Road, Shannonville, ON K0K 3A0 | 1998-06-29 |
Mitchell Labour Co. Ltd. | 7921 Rue Chabot, Montreal, QC | 1978-02-22 |
La Commission Canadienne 1979-annee Internationale De L'enfant | 99 Bank St., Ottawa, ON K1P 6C1 | 1979-02-15 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on LA COMMISSION CANADIENNE DE MISE EN VALEUR DE LA MAIN-D'OEUVRE.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.