LA SOCIÉTÉ CANADIENNE DE L'HÉRITAGE INDUSTRIEL (Corporation# 2726696) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is September 23, 1991.
Corporation ID | 2726696 |
Business Number | 875647661 |
Corporation Name |
LA SOCIÉTÉ CANADIENNE DE L'HÉRITAGE INDUSTRIEL THE CANADIAN SOCIETY FOR INDUSTRIAL HERITAGE |
Registered Office Address |
240 Sparks St Box 55122 Ottawa ON K1P 1A1 |
Incorporation Date | 1991-09-23 |
Dissolution Date | 2015-05-15 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 5 - 11 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
DOUG CAMPBELL | 110 NELSON ST, APT 201, OTTAWA ON K1N 9P2, Canada |
JIM CANDOW | UPPER WATER ST, HALIFAX NS B3J 1S0, Canada |
MARK FRAM | 53 OLIVE AVENUE, TORONTO ON M6G 1V2, Canada |
CHRISTOPHER ANDREAE | 956 DUNDAS ST, BOX 46041, LONDON ON N5W 3C0, Canada |
LARRY MCNALLY | 96 LIMBOUR, GATINEAU QC J8V 1X8, Canada |
YVON DESLOGES | 2770 DE MONTARVILLE, STE-FOY QC G1W 1V3, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1991-09-23 | current |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Act | 1991-09-22 | 1991-09-23 |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Address | 1999-03-31 | current | 240 Sparks St, Box 55122, Ottawa, ON K1P 1A1 |
Address | 1991-09-23 | current | 2380 Lancaster Road, Ottawa, ON K1G 5A3 |
Name | 1991-09-23 | current | LA SOCIÉTÉ CANADIENNE DE L'HÉRITAGE INDUSTRIEL |
Name | 1991-09-23 | current | THE CANADIAN SOCIETY FOR INDUSTRIAL HERITAGE |
Status | 2015-05-15 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 2014-12-16 | 2015-05-15 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 2004-12-16 | 2014-12-16 | Active / Actif |
Status | 2004-12-16 | 2004-12-16 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 1991-09-23 | 2004-12-16 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Dissolution | Section: 222 |
1991-09-23 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
1999 | 1997-10-31 | |
2000 | 1997-10-10 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
8587108 Canada Inc. | 240, Rue Sparks, Ottawa, ON K1P 1A1 | 2013-07-22 |
7609159 Canada Inc. | 240, Sparks Street, Suite 55066, Ottawa, ON K1P 1A1 | 2010-07-22 |
Vantage Africa Corporation - | 240 Sparks Street, # 55034, Ottawa, ON K1P 1A1 | 2005-04-20 |
Ottawa Policy Research Associates Inc. | 240 Sparks Street, P.o. Box:55021, Ottawa, ON K1P 1A1 | 2003-03-27 |
Keepartners Development Foundation | 240 Sparks Street, Number 55004, Ottawa, ON K1P 1A1 | 2007-06-21 |
First Hse World Inc. | 1 Main Street East, Suite 300 Unit 5, Ottawa, ON K1P 1A1 | 2016-06-16 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
11617141 Canada Inc. | 1607 - 324 Laurier Ave W, Ottawa, ON K1P 0A4 | 2019-09-10 |
Askella Advisory Inc. | 1905 - 324 Laurier Avenue West, Ottawa, ON K1P 0A4 | 2019-01-03 |
10970298 Canada Inc. | 2106-324 Laurier Avenue West, Ottawa, ON K1P 0A4 | 2018-08-30 |
Flux Products Inc. | 324 Laurier Ave West, Unit 2308, Ottawa, ON K1P 0A4 | 2016-02-04 |
9469630 Canada Inc. | 1210-324 Laurier Avenue West, Ottawa, ON K1P 0A4 | 2015-10-08 |
9051503 Canada Inc. | 2110-324 Laurier Avenue West, Ottawa, ON K1P 0A4 | 2014-10-15 |
Readiness Options Consulting, Inc. | 1208-324 Laurier Ave W, Ottawa, ON K1P 0A4 | 2012-09-24 |
Fresh Founders | 709-324 Laurier Avenue West, Ottawa, ON K1P 0A4 | 2012-06-12 |
8047944 Canada Inc. | 324 Laurier Avenue, #2309, Ottawa, ON K1P 0A4 | 2011-12-07 |
Carol A. Frere-leveille Consulting Ltd. | 2301-324 Laurier Avenue West, Ottawa, ON K1P 0A4 | 2010-04-08 |
Find all corporations in postal code K1P |
Name | Address |
---|---|
DOUG CAMPBELL | 110 NELSON ST, APT 201, OTTAWA ON K1N 9P2, Canada |
JIM CANDOW | UPPER WATER ST, HALIFAX NS B3J 1S0, Canada |
MARK FRAM | 53 OLIVE AVENUE, TORONTO ON M6G 1V2, Canada |
CHRISTOPHER ANDREAE | 956 DUNDAS ST, BOX 46041, LONDON ON N5W 3C0, Canada |
LARRY MCNALLY | 96 LIMBOUR, GATINEAU QC J8V 1X8, Canada |
YVON DESLOGES | 2770 DE MONTARVILLE, STE-FOY QC G1W 1V3, Canada |
City | OTTAWA |
Post Code | K1P 1A1 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Canadian Applied and Industrial Mathematics Society | 209-1725 St. Laurent Blvd., Ottawa, ON K1G 3V4 | 2000-05-30 |
La Societe Canadienne De Genie Industriel (s.c.g.i.) | 40 Queen Elizabeth Drive, Suite 1808, Ottawa, ON K2P 2C9 | 1979-08-29 |
Hms Psyche Canadian Maritime Heritage Society | 1085 4th Street, Mississauga, ON L5E 1K4 | 2018-01-22 |
Canadian Society of Microbiologists | 17 Dossetter Way, Ottawa, ON K1G 4S3 | 1958-10-21 |
Canadian Society of Agronomy Inc. | 11 Dalhousie Road, Po Box 637, Pinawa, MB R0E 1L0 | 2004-03-15 |
Canadian Society of Ocularists | 671 Main Street, Dartmouth, NS B2W 3T6 | 1998-05-13 |
Canadian Nuclear Society | 998 Bloor St. W., #501, Toronto, ON M6H 1L0 | 1998-06-09 |
Canadian Anthropology Society | 23 Java Street, Ottawa, ON K1Y 3L2 | 1976-12-07 |
Canadian Ecological Society | 535 Flagstone Court, Oshawa, ON L1K 2Z7 | 2013-07-10 |
Canadian Miniature Society | 82 Queensline Drive, Nepean, ON K2H 7J5 | 1999-10-18 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on LA SOCIÉTÉ CANADIENNE DE L'HÉRITAGE INDUSTRIEL.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.