GESTION TAR-ANCO INC. (Corporation# 2660377) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is November 9, 1990.
Corporation ID | 2660377 |
Business Number | 880091954 |
Corporation Name |
GESTION TAR-ANCO INC. TAR-ANCO HOLDINGS INC. |
Registered Office Address |
3441 Peel Street Suite 200 Montreal QC H3A 1W7 |
Incorporation Date | 1990-11-09 |
Dissolution Date | 2000-03-01 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 10 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
GEORGES H. AZZOUZ | 50 LINWOOD CRESCENT, MOUNT ROYAL QC H3P 1J2, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1990-11-09 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1990-11-08 | 1990-11-09 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 1990-11-09 | current | 3441 Peel Street, Suite 200, Montreal, QC H3A 1W7 |
Name | 1990-11-09 | current | GESTION TAR-ANCO INC. |
Name | 1990-11-09 | current | TAR-ANCO HOLDINGS INC. |
Status | 2000-03-01 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1994-03-01 | 2000-03-01 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 1990-11-09 | 1994-03-01 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2000-03-01 | Dissolution | Section: 212 |
1990-11-09 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Ariane Productions Inc. | 3441 Peel Street, Suite 500, Montreal, QC H3A 1W7 | 1990-11-20 |
Dakini Distribution Inc. | 3441 Peel Street, Suite 500, Montreal, QC H3A 1W8 | 1987-08-05 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Papiers 3f Inc. | 3419 Peel Street, Apt 2, Montreal, QC H3A 1W7 | 1994-08-31 |
Cie Capital Bingham Ward Inc. | 3463 Peel Street, Montreal, QC H3A 1W7 | 1991-10-01 |
167927 Canada Inc. | 3441 Peel, Suite 200, Montreal, QC H3A 1W7 | 1989-04-26 |
Aniko Cosmetics International Inc. | 3407 Peel, Montreal, QC H3A 1W7 | 1987-04-10 |
Archidev Inc. | 3471 Peel Street, Montreal, QC H3A 1W7 | 1985-11-01 |
Premier Park Ltd. | 3417 Peel Street, Montreal, QC H3A 1W7 | 1984-06-21 |
121706 Canada Inc. | 3501 Peel, Montreal, QC H3A 1W7 | 1983-02-24 |
Hotel Grand Continental Inc. | 3407 Peel Street, Montreal, QC H3A 1W7 | 1980-11-07 |
Les Developpements Richard Leduc Inc. | 3453 Rue Peel, App 15, Montreal, QC H3A 1W7 | 1980-06-18 |
Ariane Concept Inc. | 3441 Peel St, Suite 500, Montreal, QC H3A 1W7 | 1979-08-02 |
Find all corporations in postal code H3A1W7 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
GEORGES H. AZZOUZ | 50 LINWOOD CRESCENT, MOUNT ROYAL QC H3P 1J2, Canada |
City | MONTREAL |
Post Code | H3A1W7 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Produits Anco Ltee | 2755 Lauzon Parkway, Windsor, ON N8T 2X8 | 1971-03-18 |
Entreposage Anco Inc. | 6380 Chemin De La Cote De Liesse, St-laurent, QC H4T 1E3 | 1978-11-29 |
Emballages Anco Inc. | 650 Route 112, St-cesaire, Cte Rouvilled, QC J0L 1T0 | 1983-09-29 |
Anco Food Products (toronto) Limited | 70 Fima Crescent, Toronto, ON M8W 4V9 | |
Gestion Jsf Inc. | 201, Chemin Du Lac, Varennes, QC J3X 1P7 | |
Global Management Holdings Inc. | 9275, Henri-bourassa Est, Montreal, QC H1E 1P4 | 2007-01-01 |
Gestion Ric'art LtГ©e | 175-2333, Rue Galvani, QuГ©bec, QC G1N 4G3 | 2014-02-13 |
M.h.k. Holdings Inc. | 47 Terry Fox St., Verdun, QC H3E 1L4 | 2002-02-27 |
Hfm-eq Holdings Inc. | 307 Rue Tarrant, Magog, QC J1X 3P3 | 2020-12-10 |
F.f.e.n. Holdings Inc. | 366 Rue De Castelnau Est, MontrÉal, QC H2R 1P9 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on GESTION TAR-ANCO INC..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.