GESTION FRANÇOIS BOULARD INC. (Corporation# 2657554) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is October 31, 1990.
Corporation ID | 2657554 |
Business Number | 128672128 |
Corporation Name | GESTION FRANÇOIS BOULARD INC. |
Registered Office Address |
3677 Rue Asselin Longueuil QC J4M 2Y1 |
Incorporation Date | 1990-10-31 |
Corporation Status | Active / Actif |
Number of Directors | 1 - 10 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
FRANCOIS BOULARD | 3677 rue asselin, Longueuil QC J4M 2Y1, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1990-10-31 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1990-10-30 | 1990-10-31 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 2015-09-29 | current | 3677 Rue Asselin, Longueuil, QC J4M 2Y1 |
Address | 2012-01-06 | 2015-09-29 | 10147, Rue St-hubert, Montreal, QC H2C 2H6 |
Address | 2004-01-30 | 2012-01-06 | 527 Levis, Joliette, QC J6E 8E1 |
Address | 1990-10-31 | 2004-01-30 | 641 Rue Point Du Jour Sud, L'assomption, QC J0K 1G0 |
Name | 2016-09-01 | current | GESTION FRANÇOIS BOULARD INC. |
Name | 1990-10-31 | 2016-09-01 | FRANÇOIS BOULARD PSYCHOLOGIE INDUSTRIELLE INC. |
Status | 2000-05-10 | current | Active / Actif |
Status | 2000-02-04 | 2000-05-10 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 1996-04-17 | 2000-02-04 | Active / Actif |
Status | 1996-02-01 | 1996-04-17 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2016-09-01 | Amendment / Modification |
Name Changed. Section: 178 |
1990-10-31 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2020 | 2020-03-01 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2019 | 2019-03-01 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2018 | 2018-03-01 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2017 | 2016-03-01 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Eliova Inc. | 3660 Asselin, Longueuil, QC J4M 2Y1 | 2020-03-06 |
Husboro Inc. | 3660, Asselin, Longueuil, QC J4M 2Y1 | 2015-09-02 |
Services-conseils Pluriels Et Singuliers Inc. | 3684, Rue Asselin, Longueuil, QC J4M 2Y1 | 2002-04-09 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
3510271 Canada Inc. | 1636 Des Renards, Longueuil, QC J4M 0A2 | 1998-08-24 |
Pharmacie Г‰tienne Beaulieu (2017) Inc. | 302-1130, Rue De Sancerre, Longueuil, QC J4M 0A7 | 2016-11-24 |
9997466 Canada Inc. | 302-1130, Rue De Sancerre, Longueuil, QC J4M 0A7 | 2016-11-24 |
Capital 52 Inc. | 1109 Rue Des Samares, Longueuil, QC J4M 0A8 | 2018-06-22 |
Smart-ceb Consulting Inc. | 1049 Rue Des Samares, Longueuil, QC J4M 0A8 | 2013-07-02 |
9673873 Canada Inc. | 1505 Des Samares Street, Longueuil, QC J4M 0A9 | 2016-03-17 |
Les Habitations Yannik Inc. | 3402 Des Sapins, Longueuil, QC J4M 0B5 | 1978-04-13 |
6599818 Canada Inc. | 1422 Rue Beauharnois, Longueuil, QC J4M 1C2 | 2006-07-18 |
6185291 Canada Inc. | 1671 Beauharnois, Longueuil, Quebec, QC J4M 1C9 | 2004-01-22 |
8241791 Canada Inc. | 1355 Terrasse Beaujeu, Longueuil, QC J4M 1E5 | 2012-08-24 |
Find all corporations in postal code J4M |
Name | Address |
---|---|
FRANCOIS BOULARD | 3677 rue asselin, Longueuil QC J4M 2Y1, Canada |
City | LONGUEUIL |
Post Code | J4M 2Y1 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Gestion François Berthiaume Inc. / François Berthiaume Holdings Inc. | 101, Square Dorchester, Bureau #545, Montréal, Québec, QC H3B 1N1 | 2002-05-16 |
FranÇois Potvin Holdings Inc. | 4214 Rue Desrosiers, Pierrefonds, QC H9H 5H8 | 2011-09-30 |
Gestion FranÇois Lemieux Inc. | 218, Rue De Boissy, Mascouche, QC J7K 0R8 | 2013-04-23 |
Gestion Denondre Inc. | 151 Rue François Baillargé, Laval, QC H7L 6E9 | 1988-12-19 |
Gestion François Gingras Inc. | 492 Rue De La Providence, Granby, QC J2H 2H6 | 1995-02-20 |
Gestion Jean-franÇois Roy Inc. | 101, Rue Des Pistoles, Blainville, QC J7C 5C2 | 2008-08-18 |
Gestion FranÇois CÉrÉ Inc. | 5874 Rue Frappier, Sherbrooke, QC J1N 2K3 | 2011-12-15 |
Gestion FranÇois Parent Inc. | 27 Rue Besants, Blainville, QC J7C 5T4 | 2008-05-06 |
Gestion FranÇois De Bellefeuille Inc. | 39, Rue D'oslo, Gatineau, QC J9J 0X9 | 2018-12-04 |
Gestion L'anneau Inc. | 190, St-franÇois-xavier, Delson, QC J5B 1X9 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on GESTION FRANÇOIS BOULARD INC..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.