GESTION MICHEL & GAETAN INC. (Corporation# 254819) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is November 28, 1977.
Corporation ID | 254819 |
Corporation Name | GESTION MICHEL & GAETAN INC. |
Registered Office Address |
975 Bernard Pilon Beloeil QC |
Incorporation Date | 1977-11-28 |
Dissolution Date | 1983-03-21 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 10 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
MICHEL FORTIN | 2485 RUE MONTMARTRE, BROSSARD QC , Canada |
M MARCOUX-FORTIN | 2485 RUE MONTMARTRE, BROSSARD QC , Canada |
GAETAN LABERGE | 505 BOYD, GREENFIELD PARK QC , Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1977-11-28 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1977-11-27 | 1977-11-28 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 1977-11-28 | current | 975 Bernard Pilon, Beloeil, QC |
Name | 1977-11-28 | current | GESTION MICHEL & GAETAN INC. |
Status | 1983-03-21 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1977-11-28 | 1983-03-21 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1983-03-21 | Dissolution | |
1977-11-28 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Address | 975 BERNARD PILON |
City | BELOEIL |
Province | QC |
Country | Canada |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
116644 Canada Inc. | 975 Bernard Pilon, Beloeil, QC J3G 1L6 | 1982-08-13 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Services Immobiliers Laurent Bilodeau Inc. | 874, Rue HГ©roux, Beloeil, QC J3G 5B4 | 2020-10-05 |
12365430 Canada Inc. | 371, Rue Auger, Beloeil, QC J3G 2R6 | 2020-09-24 |
Nature & Gratitude Inc. | 104-2000 Rue Richelieu, Beloeil, QC J3G 0T4 | 2020-07-07 |
Convoyeurs Simar-dacon Inc. | 546 Rue Des Forges, Beloeil, QC J3G 0S2 | 2020-06-22 |
12099993 Canada Inc. | 1354 Louis-marchand Street, Beloeil, QC J3G 6S3 | 2020-06-02 |
Ringzer0 Team Inc. | 1021 Yolande-chartrand, Beloeil, QC J3G 0V5 | 2020-02-01 |
Rsty&co. Ltd. | 1136 Rue Azarie-lamer, Beloeil, QC J3G 0L4 | 2019-12-13 |
T21: Association Ouest Africaine - Inclusion Et Sensibiliation | 353 Rue Vincent-massey, Beloeil, QC J3G 3H8 | 2019-10-16 |
Infiniva Inc. | 893 Ange-aimГ©-lebrun, Beloeil, QC J3G 0P5 | 2019-09-05 |
11563858 Canada Inc. | 928 Rue Armand-daigle, Beloeil, QC J3G 0V9 | 2019-08-11 |
Find all corporations in BELOEIL |
Name | Address |
---|---|
MICHEL FORTIN | 2485 RUE MONTMARTRE, BROSSARD QC , Canada |
M MARCOUX-FORTIN | 2485 RUE MONTMARTRE, BROSSARD QC , Canada |
GAETAN LABERGE | 505 BOYD, GREENFIELD PARK QC , Canada |
City | BELOEIL |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Les Entreprises Gaetan Rollin Inc. | 100 Rue St-michel, Crabtree Mills, QC J0K 1B0 | 1982-04-14 |
Location De Grues Gaetan Roy LtÉe | 23 Route 105, Chelsea, QC J9B 1L3 | 2007-05-09 |
Gestion Gaetan Lafortune Inc. | 798 Rue Archambault, Laurentides, QC J0K 1C0 | 1980-11-03 |
Gestion Gaetan Roussel Inc. | 26 Audubon, Sept Iles, QC | 1980-10-29 |
Gestion Gaetan Veronneau Inc. | 317 Allee De La Seigneurie, Boucherville, QC J4B 1A7 | 1977-10-04 |
La Societe De Gestion Gaetan Inc. | 1065 Ouest Rue Boivin, Alma, QC G8B 1Y9 | 1979-06-19 |
Gestion Gaetan Jacques Inc. | 1605 Des Cassandres, L'ancienne Lorette, QC G2E 5V1 | 1983-04-18 |
Gestion Gaetan Morin Ltee | 2400 Rue Noury, Sillery, QC G1T 1N4 | 1977-10-25 |
Gestion Gaetan Adam Ltee | 25 Chemin Kildare, Rawdon, QC J0K 1S0 | 1981-10-06 |
Gestion Michel Blais (mtl) Inc. | 605, Rue Du Muscadet, RosemГ€re, QC J7A 4W8 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on GESTION MICHEL & GAETAN INC..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.