LA CORPORATION DES RESIDANTS DE LA REGION DE TIBBITS HILL (Corporation# 253847) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is November 22, 1977.
Corporation ID | 253847 |
Corporation Name |
LA CORPORATION DES RESIDANTS DE LA REGION DE TIBBITS HILL TIBBITS HILL AREA RESIDENTS CORPORATION - |
Registered Office Address |
Rr 1 Brome QC J0E 1K0 |
Incorporation Date | 1977-11-22 |
Dissolution Date | 2015-05-11 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 7 - 7 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
HELEN BROWN | 49 TIBBITS HILL ROAD, KNOWLTON QC J0E 1K0, Canada |
PIERRE BOURQUE | 156 CENTRE STREET, KNOWLTON QC J0E 1K0, Canada |
THERESE HARVEY | 60 TIBBITS HILL ROAD, KNOWLTON QC J0E 1K0, Canada |
ROBERT HARVEY | 60 TIBBITS HILL ROAD, KNOWLTON QC J0E 1K0, Canada |
RALPH LIPPER | 144 TIBBITS HILL ROAD, KNOWLTON QC J0E 1K0, Canada |
ANN WOOD | 87 TIBBITS HILL ROAD, KNOWLTON QC J0E 1K0, Canada |
CLAIRE GOHIER | 49 TIBBITS HILL ROAD, KNOWLTON QC J0E 1K0, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1977-11-22 | current |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Act | 1977-11-21 | 1977-11-22 |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Address | 1977-11-22 | current | Rr 1, Brome, QC J0E 1K0 |
Name | 1977-11-22 | current | LA CORPORATION DES RESIDANTS DE LA REGION DE TIBBITS HILL |
Name | 1977-11-22 | current | TIBBITS HILL AREA RESIDENTS CORPORATION - |
Status | 2015-05-11 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 2014-12-12 | 2015-05-11 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 2004-12-16 | 2014-12-12 | Active / Actif |
Status | 2004-12-16 | 2004-12-16 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 1977-11-22 | 2004-12-16 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | Dissolution | Section: 222 |
1977-11-22 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2000 | 1999-06-01 | |
1997 | 1996-06-15 | |
1996 | 1996-06-15 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Barwick and District Chamber of Commerce | Rr 1, Stratton, ON P0W 1N0 | 1932-11-29 |
The Crapaud-victoria Board of Trade | Rr 1, Crapaud, PE C0A 1J0 | 1944-12-05 |
Restaurant Chez Pierre Low Inc. | Rr 1, Low, QC | 1979-08-07 |
Federal Technical Surveys Inc. | Rr 1, Box 520, Paris, ON N3L 3T6 | 1979-09-10 |
Huiles Eric Smith Limitee | Rr 1, Bristol, QC J0X 1G0 | 1979-09-14 |
Flexowall Systems Limited | Rr 1, Cedar Valley, ON L0G 1E0 | 1979-09-19 |
J & R Charlebois Holdings Ltd. | Rr 1, Oxford Mills, ON K0G 1S0 | 1979-11-07 |
94467 Canada Ltd. | Rr 1, Box 309, Cape Breton, Bras D'or, NS | 1979-10-12 |
3535 Harwood Inc. | Rr 1, Box 552, Hudson, QC J0P 1H0 | 1979-10-18 |
Distributions - J. Des-serres Inc. | Rr 1, St-pie-de-bagot, QC J0H 1W0 | 1979-11-15 |
Find all corporations in the same location |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Investissemnts & Gestion De Produits Orientaux Opmi Inc. | 358 Stagecoach Road, Brome, QC J0E 1K0 | 1993-11-30 |
Institute of Organizational and Professional Options (i.o.p.o.) | 350 Jackson Road, Brome, QC J0E 1K0 | 1993-05-19 |
Brome Г‰dition Et Communication (1994) Inc. | 44 Chemin Johnston, Brome, QC J0E 1K0 | 1993-03-17 |
L'express Will-bill Inc. | 370 Stagecoach Road, Brome, QC J0E 1K0 | 1993-01-29 |
162036 Canada Inc. | 343 Stage Coach Road, Brome, QC J0E 1K0 | 1988-06-22 |
Tuiles Fendler Kachelofen Inc. | 104 Ch. Byers, Lac Brome, QC J0E 1K0 | 1987-05-26 |
Services D'entretien C-joe Inc. | Brome Terrace, Po Box 94, Brome, QC J0E 1K0 | 1984-01-25 |
Produits D'erable Pur B.r. Boule Inc. | P.o. Box 30, Brome, QC J0E 1K0 | 1982-07-06 |
111537 Canada Inc. | 44 Johnson Road, Rr 1, Brome, QC J0E 1K0 | 1981-10-15 |
94050 Canada Ltee. | Comte Missisquoi, P.o.box 34, Brome Village, QC J0E 1K0 | 1979-09-19 |
Find all corporations in postal code J0E1K0 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
HELEN BROWN | 49 TIBBITS HILL ROAD, KNOWLTON QC J0E 1K0, Canada |
PIERRE BOURQUE | 156 CENTRE STREET, KNOWLTON QC J0E 1K0, Canada |
THERESE HARVEY | 60 TIBBITS HILL ROAD, KNOWLTON QC J0E 1K0, Canada |
ROBERT HARVEY | 60 TIBBITS HILL ROAD, KNOWLTON QC J0E 1K0, Canada |
RALPH LIPPER | 144 TIBBITS HILL ROAD, KNOWLTON QC J0E 1K0, Canada |
ANN WOOD | 87 TIBBITS HILL ROAD, KNOWLTON QC J0E 1K0, Canada |
CLAIRE GOHIER | 49 TIBBITS HILL ROAD, KNOWLTON QC J0E 1K0, Canada |
City | BROME |
Post Code | J0E1K0 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Traduction M. Moquin Inc. | 156 Tibbits Hill, Knowlton, QC J0E 1K0 | 2010-05-13 |
6680712 Canada Inc. | 121 Tibbits Hill Rad, Po Box 3743, Knowlton, QC J0E 1V0 | 2006-12-31 |
155714 Canada Inc. | 87 Tibbits Hill, Town of Brome Lake, QC J0E 1V0 | 1987-04-27 |
Centaure Stables Ltd. | Rr 1, Tibbits Hill, Brome, QC | 1975-11-25 |
J.c.j. Farms (1994) Ltd. | 71 Tibbits Hill, Knowlton, QC J0E 1V0 | 1994-10-06 |
Kincsem Equestrian Imports Ltd. | Tibbits Hill Brome, Brome, QC | 1972-11-22 |
Interfaith Council of York Region | 180 West Beaver Creek Road, Richmond Hill, ON L4B 1B4 | 2015-07-11 |
Algonquin Immigration Services Corporation | 377 Tower Hill Road, Richmond Hill, ON L4E 0A5 | 2014-05-07 |
Saba Asset Management Corporation | 135 Canyon Hill Ave., Richmond Hill, ON L4C 0T1 | 2020-02-12 |
D&j Friends Holding Corporation | 10 Canyon Hill Ave, Richmond Hill, ON L4C 0S4 | 2017-03-19 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on LA CORPORATION DES RESIDANTS DE LA REGION DE TIBBITS HILL.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.