MASTER EQUITY MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. (Corporation# 2486636) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is June 20, 1989.
Corporation ID | 2486636 |
Business Number | 884632480 |
Corporation Name | MASTER EQUITY MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. |
Registered Office Address |
212 King Street West 3rd Floor Toronto ON M5H 1K5 |
Incorporation Date | 1989-06-20 |
Corporation Status | Inactive - Amalgamated / Inactif - FusionnГ©e |
Number of Directors | 1 - 10 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
MERRITT GODDARD | 362 BALSAM DRIVE, OAKVILLE ON L6J 3X7, Canada |
ROBERT J. THIESSEN | 94 HILLMOUNT AVENUE, TORONTO ON M6B 1X6, Canada |
MICHAEL E. NAIRNE | 210 RIVERSIDE DRIVE, TORONTO ON M6S 4A9, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1989-06-20 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1989-06-19 | 1989-06-20 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 1989-06-20 | current | 212 King Street West, 3rd Floor, Toronto, ON M5H 1K5 |
Name | 1990-01-30 | current | MASTER EQUITY MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. |
Name | 1989-06-20 | 1990-01-30 | MASTER EQUITY ENTERTAINMENT FUNDS INC. |
Status | 1993-01-31 | current | Inactive - Amalgamated / Inactif - FusionnГ©e |
Status | 1989-06-20 | 1993-01-31 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1989-06-20 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
1992 | 1992-02-07 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
1991 | 1992-02-07 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
1990 | 1992-02-07 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Master Equity Management Services Inc. | 320 Bay Street, Suite 1100 Box 15, Toronto, ON M5H 4A6 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
80890 Canada Ltd. | 212 King Street West, Suite 500, Toronto, ON M5H 1K5 | 1976-12-01 |
Equion Funds Inc. | 212 King Street West, 3rd Floor, Toronto, ON M5H 1K5 | |
Equion Administrative Services Ltd. | 212 King Street West, 3rd Floor, Toronto, ON M5H 1K5 | |
101391 Canada Inc. | 212 King Street West, Suite 500, Toronto, ON M5H 1K5 | 1980-12-30 |
Geraldco Holdings Inc. | 212 King Street West, Suite 500, Toronto, ON M5H 1K5 | 1982-10-26 |
Equion Holdings Limited | 212 King Street West, 3rd Floor, Toronto, ON M5H 1K5 | 1982-12-20 |
Equion Resort Palm Springs Ltd. | 212 King Street West, 3rd Floor, Toronto, ON M5H 1K5 | 1983-03-07 |
Equion Insurance Agencies Limited | 212 King Street West, 3rd Floor, Toronto, ON M5H 1K5 | 1983-11-04 |
Equion Financial Planning Inc. | 212 King Street West, 3rd Floor, Toronto, ON M5H 1K5 | 1983-12-05 |
Tap Mineral Exploration Management Ltd. | 212 King Street West, 4th Floor, Toronto, ON M5H 1K5 | 1985-05-28 |
Find all corporations in the same location |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Ecology Pure Air Systems (1993) Inc. | 212 King St West, Suite 200, Toronto, ON M5H 1K5 | 1993-03-15 |
Symonsure Groupe Ltee. | 212 King St. West, Suite 500, Toronto, ON M5H 1K5 | |
La Societe Internationale Symons Holdings Ltee | 212 King St. West, Suite 500, Toronto, ON M5H 1K5 | 1983-03-14 |
Pafco Financial Holdings Ltd. | 212 King Street West, Suite 500, Toronto, ON M5H 1K5 | 1985-12-30 |
Telfer's Tower Club (hotels) Limited | 212 King Street West, Suite 208, Toronto, ON M5H 1K5 | 1986-12-24 |
Le Groupe International Symons Ltee | 212 King Street West, Suite 500, Toronto, ON M5H 1K5 | |
Geraldco Holdings Inc. | 212 King Street West, Suite 500, Toronto, ON M5H 1K5 | |
Telfer's Tower Club (toronto) Inc. | 212 King Street West, Suite 208, Toronto, ON M5H 1K5 | 1989-03-30 |
Master Equity Funds Inc. | 212 King Street West, 3rd Floor, Toronto, ON M5H 1K5 | 1989-06-20 |
Master Equity Mineral Resources Funds Inc. | 212 King St West, 3rd Floor, Toronto, ON M5H 1K5 | 1989-06-20 |
Find all corporations in postal code M5H1K5 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
MERRITT GODDARD | 362 BALSAM DRIVE, OAKVILLE ON L6J 3X7, Canada |
ROBERT J. THIESSEN | 94 HILLMOUNT AVENUE, TORONTO ON M6B 1X6, Canada |
MICHAEL E. NAIRNE | 210 RIVERSIDE DRIVE, TORONTO ON M6S 4A9, Canada |
City | TORONTO |
Post Code | M5H1K5 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Master Equity Management Services Ltd. | 360 Main Street, 1500, Winnipeg, MB R3C 3Z3 | |
Master Equity Investments Inc. | 360 Main St, Suite 1500, Winnipeg, MB R3C 3Z3 | |
Master Equity Oil & Gas Funds Inc. | 320 Bay Street, Suite 1100 Box 15, Toronto, ON M5H 4A6 | 1989-06-20 |
Master Equity Funds Inc. | 212 King Street West, 3rd Floor, Toronto, ON M5H 1K5 | 1989-06-20 |
Midas Touch Master Mind Management Services Corporation | 127 Dunlop Court, Brampton, ON L6X 5A6 | 2012-04-24 |
Master Equity Mineral Resources Funds Inc. | 212 King St West, 3rd Floor, Toronto, ON M5H 1K5 | 1989-06-20 |
Master Equity Real Estate Funds Inc. | 212 King Street West, 3rd Floor, Toronto, ON M5H 1K5 | 1989-06-20 |
Master Craftsman Garage Door Services Inc. | 2911-55 Harbour Sq., Toronto, ON M5J 2L1 | 2010-01-04 |
Arc Equity Management (fund 4) (se 1) Ltd. | 4300, 400 - 3rd Avenue Sw, Calgary, AB T2P 4H2 | 2004-10-04 |
Arc Equity Management (fund 4) Ltd. | 4300- 400-3 Avenue Sw, Calgary, AB T2P 4H2 | 2004-02-13 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on MASTER EQUITY MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.