COMMAND INTERNATIONAL DISTRIBUTIONS INC. (Corporation# 2259044) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is November 5, 1987.
Corporation ID | 2259044 |
Business Number | 101406684 |
Corporation Name |
COMMAND INTERNATIONAL DISTRIBUTIONS INC. DISTRIBUTIONS INTERNATIONALES COMMAND INC. |
Registered Office Address |
4878 Rue Levy Suite 200 St-laurent QC H4R 2P1 |
Incorporation Date | 1987-11-05 |
Dissolution Date | 2003-11-10 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 5 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
JOHANNE DALTON | 1066 RIVE BOISEE, PIERREFONDS QC H8X 2Y7, Canada |
FRANCISCO DE LA VEGA | 4590 AVENUE MILLER, LORRAINE QC H3W 2E3, Canada |
GENEVIEVE LALONDE | 925 RUE GOHIER, ST LAURENT QC H4L 3J4, Canada |
JOHANNE DALTON | 1066 RIVE BOISÉE, PIERREFONDS QC H8Z 2Y7, Canada |
DANIEL DOYON | 146 RUE DUFRESNE, ST LUC QC J2W 1M1, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1987-11-05 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1987-11-04 | 1987-11-05 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 2002-06-05 | current | 4878 Rue Levy, Suite 200, St-laurent, QC H4R 2P1 |
Address | 1987-11-05 | 2002-06-05 | 2155 Onesime Gagnon, Lachine, QC H8T 3M7 |
Name | 1987-11-05 | current | COMMAND INTERNATIONAL DISTRIBUTIONS INC. |
Name | 1987-11-05 | current | DISTRIBUTIONS INTERNATIONALES COMMAND INC. |
Status | 2003-11-10 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1999-04-26 | 2003-11-10 | Active / Actif |
Status | 1999-02-05 | 1999-04-26 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2003-11-10 | Dissolution | Section: 210 |
2002-06-05 | Amendment / Modification | RO Changed. |
1987-11-05 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2001 | 2002-04-25 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
1999 | 2000-04-01 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2000 | 2000-02-29 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Address | 4878 RUE LEVY |
City | ST-LAURENT |
Province | QC |
Postal Code | H4R 2P1 |
Country | Canada |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Les Distillateurs Canadiens Ltee | 4878 Rue Levy, Suite 200, St. Laurent, QC H4R 2P1 | 1953-07-09 |
177750 Canada Inc. | 4878 Rue Levy, Suite 200, St-laurent, QC H4R 2P1 | 1978-10-02 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Thales Optronics Canada Inc. | 4868 Levy Street, St-laurent, QC H4R 2P1 | 1999-06-23 |
Seagram (chine) Ltee | 4858 Levy, Montreal, QC H4R 2P1 | 1968-04-05 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
8212198 Canada Inc. | 3135 Ernest-hemingway Ave., Apt. 201, Saint-laurent, QC H4R 0A1 | 2012-06-07 |
7798202 Canada Inc. | 3135 Avenue Ernest - Hemingway # 305, MontrГ©al, QC H4R 0A1 | 2011-03-07 |
7265913 Canada Inc. | 3195 Avenue Ernest - Hemingway, Suite 202, MontrГ©al, QC H4R 0A1 | 2009-11-01 |
2976609 Canada Inc. | 301-3135 Ernest-hemingway Ave, Saint-laurent, QC H4R 0A1 | 1993-11-26 |
James Dean Restaurant Inc. | 3195 Avenue Ernest - Hemingway, Suite 202, MontrГ©al, QC H4R 0A1 | 2018-03-06 |
120054 Canada Inc. | 3155 Ernest-hemingway, #301, St-laurent, QC H4R 0A2 | 1982-12-23 |
Aratrans Canada Inc. | 304-3175 Ernest Hemingway, St. Laurent, QC H4R 0A3 | 1989-03-01 |
2946424 Canada Inc. | 3195 Ernest Hemingway, Unit 202, Saint-laurent, QC H4R 0A4 | 1993-08-18 |
Zarayan Financial Services Inc. | 4239 Jean-talon O., #1202, Montreal, QC H4R 0A5 | 1991-09-25 |
Grand Galaxy Entertainment Inc. | 208-3095 Av Ernest-hemingway, Montreal, QC H4R 0A6 | 2018-11-19 |
Find all corporations in postal code H4R |
Name | Address |
---|---|
JOHANNE DALTON | 1066 RIVE BOISEE, PIERREFONDS QC H8X 2Y7, Canada |
FRANCISCO DE LA VEGA | 4590 AVENUE MILLER, LORRAINE QC H3W 2E3, Canada |
GENEVIEVE LALONDE | 925 RUE GOHIER, ST LAURENT QC H4L 3J4, Canada |
JOHANNE DALTON | 1066 RIVE BOISÉE, PIERREFONDS QC H8Z 2Y7, Canada |
DANIEL DOYON | 146 RUE DUFRESNE, ST LUC QC J2W 1M1, Canada |
City | ST-LAURENT |
Post Code | H4R 2P1 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Command Communications Graphiques Inc. | 2300 Yonge Street, Suite 503, Toronto, ON M4P 1E4 | 1987-05-27 |
Distributions Internationales M.n.s. Helios Inc. | 4126 Rang 4 S, Valcourt, QC J0E 2L0 | 1993-11-09 |
Marcor International Distributions Inc. | 6469, Newman Avenue, La Salle, QC H4E 4L9 | 2001-10-24 |
Command Base Creative Design Inc. | 1572 Pinewood Crescent, North Bay, ON P1B 4P4 | |
Strategic Command Centres International (stratcom) Ltd. | 155 Queen Street, Suite 304, Ottawa, ON K1P 6L1 | 1994-10-28 |
Les Distributions Yogwe International S.c.c. | 305 Rue Des Conseillers, St-alexandre Iberville, QC J0J 1S0 | 1983-06-16 |
Queport International Distribution Ltd. | 2590 Boul. Laurier, Suite 730, Ste-foy, QC G1V 4M6 | 1989-01-18 |
Les Distributions Internationales Widex Inc. | 1001 De Maisonneuve Blvd West, Suite 1400, Montreal, QC H3A 3C8 | 1981-01-19 |
Distributions Radiatech Internationales LtÉe | 4530 Des Peupliers, La Dore, QC G8J 1E5 | 2003-02-17 |
Seaslide Distributions Internationales Inc. | 336 Rue Des Parulines, Orford, QC J1X 3W3 | 1995-09-26 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on COMMAND INTERNATIONAL DISTRIBUTIONS INC..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.