GESTION MULTIPIX (CANADA) INC. (Corporation# 2160811) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is February 16, 1987.
Corporation ID | 2160811 |
Business Number | 105938674 |
Corporation Name |
GESTION MULTIPIX (CANADA) INC. MULTIPIX MANAGEMENT (CANADA) INC. |
Registered Office Address |
1998 Ch. Pointe-leblanc St-anicet QC J0S 1L0 |
Incorporation Date | 1987-02-16 |
Corporation Status | Active / Actif |
Number of Directors | 1 - 10 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
SYLVAIN PROULX | 4446 BOUL. ST-LAURENT, BUREAU 805, MONTREAL QC H2W 1Z5, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1987-02-16 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1987-02-15 | 1987-02-16 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 2009-09-29 | current | 1998 Ch. Pointe-leblanc, St-anicet, QC J0S 1L0 |
Address | 2004-07-29 | 2009-09-29 | 680-1 Paul Doyon, Boucherville, QC H4B 8S8 |
Address | 1987-02-16 | 2004-07-29 | 1440 Rue De Jaffa, Laval, QC H7P 4K9 |
Name | 1994-02-17 | current | GESTION MULTIPIX (CANADA) INC. |
Name | 1994-02-17 | current | MULTIPIX MANAGEMENT (CANADA) INC. |
Name | 1987-02-16 | 1994-02-17 | 154499 CANADA INC. |
Status | 1993-07-29 | current | Active / Actif |
Status | 1993-06-01 | 1993-07-29 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1987-02-16 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2020 | 2019-06-28 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2019 | 2018-06-28 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2018 | 2017-06-28 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
114820 Canada Inc. | 1998 Ch. Pointe-leblanc, St-anicet, QC J0S 1L0 | 1982-03-29 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Hellfire Manor Ltd. | 7564, Chemin De Dundee Centre, Ste-agnГЁs-de-dundee, QC J0S 1L0 | 2018-12-12 |
Walsh Adventures Inc. | 7626 Chemin Ridge, Sainte-agnГЁs-de-dundee, QC J0S 1L0 | 2016-01-29 |
Topline Ag Sales Inc. | 6437 Ridge Road, Godmanchester, QC J0S 1L0 | 2015-04-01 |
Les Productions Rabid Dogs Inc. | 1998 Chemin Pointe Leblanc, St-anicet, QC J0S 1L0 | 2014-07-22 |
Crazy Love Productions Inc. | 1998 Ch. De La Pointe-leblanc, Saint-anicet, QC J0S 1L0 | 2014-02-28 |
Slam Ball Productions Inc. | 1998, Ch. De La Pointe-leblanc, Saint-anicet, QC J0S 1L0 | 2014-01-16 |
7287941 Canada Inc. | 7613 Chemin De La Pointe Fraser, Dundee, QC J0S 1L0 | 2009-12-01 |
6606261 Canada Inc. | 8754 Hopkins Point, Dundee, QC J0S 1L0 | 2006-07-31 |
Armhurst Farms Inc. | 7911 Dundee Center Road, St-angГ€s De Dundee, QC J0S 1L0 | 2002-12-04 |
Dundee Cnc Precision Inc. | 7690 Dundee Center Road, Ste-agnes-de-dundee, QC J0S 1L0 | 2002-07-22 |
Find all corporations in postal code J0S 1L0 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
SYLVAIN PROULX | 4446 BOUL. ST-LAURENT, BUREAU 805, MONTREAL QC H2W 1Z5, Canada |
City | St-Anicet |
Post Code | J0S 1L0 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Multipix Communications Inc. | 38 Place Du Commerce, Suite 10, Ile Des Soeurs, QC H3E 1T8 | 1994-02-09 |
Canadian Institute for Consulting and Training In Management, International Business, and Crisis Management Cictm Incorporated | 3595 Girouard Ave, MontrГ©al, QC H4A 3C5 | 2010-06-07 |
Ubs Investment Management Canada Inc. | 154 University Avenue, Toronto, ON M5H 3Z4 | |
I.t.s. Management (canada) Ltd. | 406 Rue St-francois Xavier, Montreal, QC | 1970-03-23 |
Farm Management Canada | 300 - 250 City Centre Avenue, Ottawa, ON K1R 6K7 | 1992-11-12 |
Mbi Gestion Par Interet Canada Inc. | 280 Sherbourne St, Suite 17, Toronto, ON M5A 2S1 | 1978-05-16 |
Canada Life Investment Management Ltd. | 255 Dufferin Avenue, London, ON N6A 4K1 | 2020-06-09 |
Ram Canada Gestion AccГ€s Rapide Inc. | 71 Ch. D' Auteuil, Candiac, QC J5R 5H5 | 1986-04-28 |
Gestion Ic Fonds (canada) Inc. | 207 Adelaide Street East, Suite 102, Toronto, ON M5A 1M8 | 1995-11-28 |
Csl Gestion D'infrastructures Canada Inc. | 455 Rene Levesque Blvd. West, Montreal, QC H2Z 1Z3 | 1998-04-28 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on GESTION MULTIPIX (CANADA) INC..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.