PAUL CHENG INVESTMENTS CANADA INC. (Corporation# 2077841) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is July 14, 1986.
Corporation ID | 2077841 |
Business Number | 138785670 |
Corporation Name | PAUL CHENG INVESTMENTS CANADA INC. |
Registered Office Address |
398 Victoria St. London ON N5Y 4A9 |
Incorporation Date | 1986-07-14 |
Corporation Status | Active / Actif |
Number of Directors | 1 - 1 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
PAUL CHENG | 398 VICTORIA STREET, LONDON ON N5Y 4A9, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1986-07-14 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1986-07-13 | 1986-07-14 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 2008-03-31 | current | 398 Victoria St., London, ON N5Y 4A9 |
Address | 1986-07-14 | 2008-03-31 | 1108 Dundas Street East, London, ON N5W 3A7 |
Name | 1991-07-04 | current | PAUL CHENG INVESTMENTS CANADA INC. |
Name | 1986-07-14 | 1991-07-04 | GRIBBLE-NEUTRON CANADA INC. |
Status | 2010-02-04 | current | Active / Actif |
Status | 2009-12-15 | 2010-02-04 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 2006-11-06 | 2009-12-15 | Active / Actif |
Status | 2006-09-08 | 2006-11-06 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 2003-10-21 | 2006-09-08 | Active / Actif |
Status | 1997-11-01 | 2003-10-21 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 1991-07-11 | 1997-11-01 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1986-07-14 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2020 | 2020-03-12 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2018 | 2018-03-31 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2016 | 2016-09-14 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2015 | 2015-06-30 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
11699075 Canada Inc. | 130 Mcmahen Street, London, ON N5Y 0A2 | 2019-10-24 |
Aa Aviation Inc. | 446, Mcmahen Street, London, ON N5Y 0A2 | 2013-06-05 |
Vaanya Consultants Inc. | 803-629 Kipps Lane, London, ON N5Y 0A3 | 2019-04-17 |
10710229 Canada Corp. | 614-629 Kipps Lane, London, ON N5Y 0A3 | 2018-03-30 |
8635862 Canada Inc. | 902-629 Kipps Lane, London, ON N5Y 0A3 | 2013-09-16 |
Wherezmah Inc. | #315, 629 Kipps Lane, London, ON N5Y 0A3 | 2009-01-31 |
Kanungo Nirmal Chand Transportation Ltd. | 416, 621 Kipps Lane, London, ON N5Y 0B1 | 2020-11-11 |
12175061 Canada Inc. | 621 Kipps Lane, Unit 1016, London, ON N5Y 0B1 | 2020-07-05 |
11379623 Canada Inc. | Unit 508 - 621 Kipps Lane, London, ON N5Y 0B1 | 2019-04-27 |
Deliverico Canada Services Inc. | 1118-621 Kipps Lane, London, ON N5Y 0B1 | 2019-04-16 |
Find all corporations in postal code N5Y |
Name | Address |
---|---|
PAUL CHENG | 398 VICTORIA STREET, LONDON ON N5Y 4A9, Canada |
City | LONDON |
Post Code | N5Y 4A9 |
Category | investment |
Category + City | investment + LONDON |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Commerce Wei Cheng Inc. | 8260 Santiago, Brossard, QC J4X 1T6 | 1990-06-22 |
Rose-paul Investments Inc. | 2015 Drummond Street, Suite 1050, Montreal, QC H3G 1W7 | 1983-05-10 |
Investissements Paul Kizner Inc. | 4555 Bonavista, Suite 1004, Montreal, QC H3W 2C7 | 1982-09-23 |
Placements Jean-paul GuГ©rin Inc. | 58 Ch. Fournel, Sainte-anne-des-lacs, QC J0R 1B0 | 1992-10-20 |
Paul Brosseau Investments Ltd. | 59 2nd Concession, Grenville-sur-la-rouge, QC J0V 1B0 | 1986-12-19 |
Paul Raymond Investments Ltd. | 1 Rue RenГ©-thГ©rien, Gatineau, QC J9H 5Z5 | 2020-01-24 |
Andre Paul Lefebvre Investments Inc. | 4 Lakeshore Blvd, Beaconsfield, QC H9W 4H4 | 1983-10-04 |
Andre Paul Lefebvre Investments Inc. | 325 Norman, Lachine, QC H8R 1A3 | |
Cheng On Canada Inc. | 69 De La Gauchetiere West, Montreal, QC H2Z 1C2 | 2013-10-20 |
Cheng's Ontat Canada Inc. | 69 De La Gauchetiere West, Montreal, QC H2Z 1C2 | 1991-07-02 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on PAUL CHENG INVESTMENTS CANADA INC..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.