HISG SURGICAL SUPPLY GROUP INC. (Corporation# 2074095) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is July 11, 1986.
Corporation ID | 2074095 |
Business Number | 877051870 |
Corporation Name | HISG SURGICAL SUPPLY GROUP INC. |
Registered Office Address |
35 Mobile Drive Toronto ON M4A 2P6 |
Incorporation Date | 1986-07-11 |
Dissolution Date | 1996-02-01 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 7 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
MARGARET HAMILTON | 1 FERNWOOD GARDENS APT 201, TORONTO ON M4K 2J8, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1986-07-11 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1986-07-10 | 1986-07-11 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 1986-07-11 | current | 35 Mobile Drive, Toronto, ON M4A 2P6 |
Name | 1986-07-11 | current | HISG SURGICAL SUPPLY GROUP INC. |
Status | 1996-02-01 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1988-11-05 | 1996-02-01 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 1986-07-11 | 1988-11-05 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1996-02-01 | Dissolution | |
1986-07-11 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Apcc Advanced Pollution Control Corporation | 35 Mobile Drive, Toronto, ON M4A 2P6 | 1986-07-08 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Ags Painters Inc. | 2-1776 O'connor Dr, Suite 315, Toronto, ON M4A 0A1 | 2008-01-04 |
Einzay Ventures Inc. | 17 Collip Place, North York, ON M4A 0A3 | 2019-10-02 |
Righteous Ends Inc. | 7 Collip Pl, North York, ON M4A 0A3 | 2016-04-18 |
Ruble Jewellery & Watch Inc. | 23a Hobson Avenue, Toronto, ON M4A 0A3 | 2011-07-13 |
Terrestrial Trading Company Ltd. | 7 Collip Pl, North York, ON M4A 0A3 | 2016-08-09 |
12399903 Canada Inc. | 25a Hobson Ave, North York, ON M4A 0A4 | 2020-10-07 |
H. Hashi Holdings Inc. | 39 Wakunda Place, Toronto, ON M4A 1A1 | 2010-08-15 |
Cadetrip Incorporated | 702-5 Wakunda, Toronto, ON M4A 1A2 | 2011-11-17 |
12365260 Canada Inc. | 8-30 Wakunda Place, Toronto, ON M4A 1A3 | 2020-09-24 |
10600334 Canada Inc. | 3-20 Wakunda Place, Toronto, ON M4A 1A3 | 2018-01-25 |
Find all corporations in postal code M4A |
Name | Address |
---|---|
MARGARET HAMILTON | 1 FERNWOOD GARDENS APT 201, TORONTO ON M4K 2J8, Canada |
City | TORONTO |
Post Code | M4A2P6 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Triple "s" Surgical Supply Inc. | 75 Charolais Blvd., Ph 7, Brampton, ON L6Y 2R8 | 1983-07-08 |
Canadian Society of Surgical Oncology | Pmh Surgical Oncology, Opg Wing, 6th Floor, 610 University Ave, Toronto, ON M5G 2M9 | 2003-06-10 |
Canadian Medical and Surgical Knowledge Translation Research Group | 110 Yorkminster Road, Toronto, ON M2P 1M6 | 2015-09-14 |
Simply Supply Group Inc. | 70 Bongard Avenue, Ottawa, ON K2E 7Z9 | 2018-11-08 |
World Supply Xchange Wsx Group Inc. | 2400 Rue Michelin, Laval, QC H7L 5C3 | 2009-08-12 |
Johanna Supply Group Inc. | 63 Medulla Avenue, Unit 2, Toronto, ON M8Z 5L6 | 2017-08-01 |
Brewers Supply Group (canada) Limited | 1700-421-7th Avenue Sw, Calgary, AB T2P 4K9 | |
Brewers Supply Group (canada) Limited | 1700 - 421 7 Avenue Sw, Calgary, AB T2P 4K9 | |
Supply and Marketing Group Consilior | 643 Grosvenor, Westmount, QC H3Y 2S9 | 1997-12-10 |
Metro Supply Chain Group Inc. | 375 Roland-therien Blvd., Suite 210, Longeuil, QC J4H 4A6 | 2005-07-18 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on HISG SURGICAL SUPPLY GROUP INC..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.