SMOKERS' FREEDOM SOCIETY (S.L.F.-S.F.S.) (Corporation# 2055783) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is May 21, 1986.
Corporation ID | 2055783 |
Business Number | 886071778 |
Corporation Name |
SMOKERS' FREEDOM SOCIETY (S.L.F.-S.F.S.) SOCIETE POUR LA LIBERTE DES FUMEURS (S.L.F.-S.F.S.) |
Registered Office Address |
8615 Boulevard St-laurent Suite 300 Montreal QC H2P 2M9 |
Incorporation Date | 1986-05-21 |
Dissolution Date | 1995-10-16 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 3 - 3 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
CHARLES MEUNIER | 361 RUE NOTRE-DAME, LAVALTRIE QC J0K 1H0, Canada |
DENISE POTVIN | 4383 A RUE BREBEUF, MONTREAL QC H2J 3K8, Canada |
JEAN CLAVEL | 165 CH DE LA COTE STE CATHERINE, MONTREAL QC H2V 2A7, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1986-05-21 | current |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Act | 1986-05-20 | 1986-05-21 |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Address | 1986-08-21 | current | 8615 Boulevard St-laurent, Suite 300, Montreal, QC H2P 2M9 |
Name | 1986-05-21 | current | SMOKERS' FREEDOM SOCIETY (S.L.F.-S.F.S.) |
Name | 1986-05-21 | current | SOCIETE POUR LA LIBERTE DES FUMEURS (S.L.F.-S.F.S.) |
Status | 1995-10-16 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1986-05-21 | 1995-10-16 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1995-10-16 | Dissolution | |
1986-05-21 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
2777941 Canada Inc. | 8585 Boulevard St-laurent, Bureau 300, Montreal, QC H2P 2M9 | 1991-12-10 |
Mobiliere 2001 Inc. | 8675 St-laurent, Montreal, QC H2P 2M9 | 1985-10-01 |
134068 Canada Inc. | 8631 St. Laurent, Montreal, QC H2P 2M9 | 1985-01-03 |
137346 Canada Inc. | 8543 St-laurent, Montreal, QC H2P 2M9 | 1984-11-16 |
133988 Canada Inc. | 8627 Boul. St-laurent, Montreal, QC H2P 2M9 | 1984-10-05 |
135343 Canada Inc. | 8541 Boul. St-laurent, Montreal, QC H2P 2M9 | 1984-09-12 |
Gestion Immobiliere Prolixe Inc. | 8585 Boul St-laurent, Bur. 300, Montreal, QC H2P 2M9 | 1984-05-24 |
177609 Canada Inc. | 8601 St-laurent Blvd., Montreal, QC H2P 2M9 | 1984-02-08 |
117548 Canada Ltee | 8585 St Laurent, Montreal, QC H2P 2M9 | 1982-09-29 |
R.e.t.s. Radio Electronic Television School Ltd. | 8607 Boul. St-laurent, Montreal, QC H2P 2M9 | 1982-07-07 |
Find all corporations in postal code H2P2M9 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
CHARLES MEUNIER | 361 RUE NOTRE-DAME, LAVALTRIE QC J0K 1H0, Canada |
DENISE POTVIN | 4383 A RUE BREBEUF, MONTREAL QC H2J 3K8, Canada |
JEAN CLAVEL | 165 CH DE LA COTE STE CATHERINE, MONTREAL QC H2V 2A7, Canada |
City | MONTREAL |
Post Code | H2P2M9 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
The Canadian Association for The Protection of Rights of Smokers | 180 Lilac Avenue, Dorval, QC H9S 3M1 | 1986-06-19 |
Le Conseil Canadien Pour La Paix Dans La Liberte | 789 Don Mills Rd, Suite 1525, Don Mills, ON M3C 1T5 | 1983-05-16 |
Parents (et Amis) Des Fumeurs Morts Et Mourants | 33 Ridelle Avenue, Toronto, ON M6B 1H7 | 1987-03-27 |
Holiday Freedom Inc. | 143 Sherbrooke, Hull, QC H8Y 2L4 | 1986-05-13 |
Association Pour Le Respect Des Droits Des Fumeurs | 400 Boul. St-martin Ouest, Bur. 309, Laval, QC H7M 3Y8 | 1999-12-10 |
Societe Canadienne Pour Une Meilleure Comprehension De La Chine | 540 Manor Ave., Ottawa, ON K1M 0J7 | 1985-05-02 |
Societe De Droits D'auteurs Pour Les Consommateurs | 2171 Avenue Road, Suite 305, Toronto, ON M5M 4B4 | 1927-07-16 |
La Societe Pour L'avancement Du Patriotisme Canadien | 5177 Willmott Street, Niagara Falls, ON L2E 2A6 | 1977-06-01 |
La Societe Canadienne Pour L'etude De L'enseignement Superieur | 260 Dalhousie Street, Suite 204, Ottawa, ON K1N 7E4 | 1989-01-25 |
Societe Immobiliere Induscom Inc. | 215 Ave. Liberte, Candiac, QC J5R 3X8 | 1979-08-22 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on SMOKERS' FREEDOM SOCIETY (S.L.F.-S.F.S.).
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.