BOIS TOURNAGES ALLEN ROGERS INC. (Corporation# 1964976) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is August 6, 1985.
Corporation ID | 1964976 |
Corporation Name |
BOIS TOURNAGES ALLEN ROGERS INC. ALLEN ROGERS WOOD TURNINGS INC. |
Registered Office Address |
800 Victoria Square Suite 3400 Montreal QC H4Z 1E9 |
Incorporation Date | 1985-08-06 |
Dissolution Date | 1994-12-08 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 10 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
HARWOOD B. COMSTOCK | MAIN STREET, P.O. BOX 367, IVORYTON, CONNECTICUT , United States |
NATHALIE MERCURE | 800 PLACE VICTORIA, BUREAU 3400, MONTREAL QC H4Z 1E9, Canada |
ROBERT B. ISSENMAN | 800 VICTORIA SQUARE, SUITE 3400, MONTREAL QC H4Z 1E9, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1985-08-06 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1985-08-05 | 1985-08-06 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 1985-08-06 | current | 800 Victoria Square, Suite 3400, Montreal, QC H4Z 1E9 |
Name | 1985-08-06 | current | BOIS TOURNAGES ALLEN ROGERS INC. |
Name | 1985-08-06 | current | ALLEN ROGERS WOOD TURNINGS INC. |
Status | 1994-12-19 | 1994-12-08 | Active / Actif |
Status | 1994-12-08 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1993-12-01 | 1994-12-19 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1994-12-08 | Dissolution | |
1985-08-06 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
1994 | 1990-07-10 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
1993 | 1990-07-10 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
1992 | 1990-07-10 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Mc Asphalte Inc. | 800 Victoria Square, Suite 720, Montreal, QC H4Z 1E4 | 1979-08-28 |
Rig-tech (canada) Inc. | 800 Victoria Square, Suite 612, Montreal, QC | 1979-09-11 |
Les Tricots Pickfair (canada) Ltee | 800 Victoria Square, Suite 4100, Montreal, QC H4Z 1H9 | 1979-09-26 |
Les Encanteurs Du Quebec Inc. | 800 Victoria Square, Suite 4702, Montreal, QC H4Z 1H6 | 1979-11-06 |
Sogeriam Inc. | 800 Victoria Square, Ste 4702 Po Box 322, Montreal, QC H4Z 1H6 | 1979-11-06 |
Sobag Inc. | 800 Victoria Square, Suite 4702, Montreal, QC H4Z 1H6 | 1979-11-06 |
Fineartplan Limited | 800 Victoria Square, Suite 720, Montreal, QC H4Z 1E4 | 1969-12-23 |
Pepinieres Luke Freres Ltee | 800 Victoria Square, Suite 720, Montreal 115, QC | 1947-06-05 |
Glem Research and Expansion of Canada Inc. | 800 Victoria Square, Suite 3400 P.o.box 242, Montreal, QC H4Z 1E9 | 1976-08-23 |
A C L Copies Ltd./ltee | 800 Victoria Square, Suite 2501, Montreal, QC H4Z 1C2 | 1976-09-16 |
Find all corporations in the same location |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
3422445 Canada Inc. | 800, Place Victoria, Bur.3400, Montreal, QC H4Z 1E9 | 1998-10-13 |
2735857 Canada Inc. | 800 Place-victoria, Suite 3400 Po Box 242, Montreal, QC H4Z 1E9 | 1991-07-22 |
Sporthletique Inc. | Station Place Victoria, Suite 3400 Box 242, Montreal, QC H4Z 1E9 | 1990-08-28 |
Geslor Inc. | 3400 Tour De La Bourse, Suite 800 C.p. 242, Montreal, QC H4Z 1E9 | 1988-11-04 |
162329 Canada Inc. | 3400 The Stock Exchange Tower, P.o. Box 242, Montreal, QC H4Z 1E9 | 1988-07-05 |
La Compagnie Negociante Wai Kwong Wah Limitee | Square Victoria, Box 242, Montreal, QC H4Z 1E9 | 1986-11-26 |
147908 Canada Inc. | 800 Stock Exchange Tower, Suite 3400, Montreal, QC H4Z 1E9 | 1985-12-18 |
Modes Et Merveilles Molly Inc. | 800 The Stock Exchange Tower, Suite 3400 Box 242, Montreal, QC H4Z 1E9 | 1985-09-20 |
141133 Canada Inc. | 3400 La Tour De La Bourse, Box 242, Montreal, QC H4Z 1E9 | 1985-04-01 |
Immeubles Mis (montreal) Inc. | 3400 Stock Exchange Tower, Box 242, Montreal, QC H4Z 1E9 | 1983-10-14 |
Find all corporations in postal code H4Z1E9 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
HARWOOD B. COMSTOCK | MAIN STREET, P.O. BOX 367, IVORYTON, CONNECTICUT , United States |
NATHALIE MERCURE | 800 PLACE VICTORIA, BUREAU 3400, MONTREAL QC H4Z 1E9, Canada |
ROBERT B. ISSENMAN | 800 VICTORIA SQUARE, SUITE 3400, MONTREAL QC H4Z 1E9, Canada |
City | MONTREAL |
Post Code | H4Z1E9 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Allen & Allen International Sales Inc. | 1421 Claymor Avenue, Ottawa, ON K2C 1S7 | 1987-08-05 |
Allen, Fox & Associes Inc. | 8180 Devonshire, Suite 4, Mount Royal, QC H4P 2K3 | 1994-08-25 |
Allen Interiors By Gail Allen Inc. | #117-21 Diana Avenue, Brantford, ON N3T 0G7 | 2006-06-07 |
Rogers Sugar Ltd. | Foot of Rogers Street, Box 2150, Vancouver, BC V6B 3V2 | |
Rogers Wireless Inc. | 333 Bloor Street East, 10th Floor, Toronto, ON M4W 1G9 | |
Allen Expedition Internationale Limitee | 150 Rue Adrien Robert, Local D, Hull, QC J8Y 3S2 | 1980-11-18 |
Produits Pharmaceutiques Rogers Limitee | 800 Denison Street, Suite 18, Markham, ON L3R 5M9 | 1938-08-20 |
Rogers Publishing Limited | 333 Bloor Street East, 10th Floor, Toronto, ON M4W 1G9 | |
Radical Hair and Spa Inc. | 549 Rogers Rd., 549 Rogers Dr., Toronto, ON M9M 1B4 | 2012-01-19 |
Rogers Sugar Inc. | 123 Rogers Street, Vancouver, BC V6B 3V2 | 2010-07-26 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on BOIS TOURNAGES ALLEN ROGERS INC..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.