CRS WORLD CHARTERS LIMITED (Corporation# 1946099) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is May 30, 1985.
Corporation ID | 1946099 |
Business Number | 882867468 |
Corporation Name | CRS WORLD CHARTERS LIMITED |
Registered Office Address |
2651 Yonge Suite 2a Toronto ON M4P 2J6 |
Incorporation Date | 1985-05-30 |
Dissolution Date | 1993-10-04 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 3 - 7 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
W. THOMAS COOPER | 2651 YONGE, APP. 2A, TORONTO ON M4P 2J6, Canada |
D. KENNITH SAUNDERS | 767A PAPE AVE, TORONTO ON M4K 3T2, Canada |
C.J. MAUREEN RYLEY | 12 HAMMERSMITH, TORONTO ON M4E 2W4, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1985-05-30 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1985-05-29 | 1985-05-30 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 1985-05-30 | current | 2651 Yonge, Suite 2a, Toronto, ON M4P 2J6 |
Name | 1985-05-30 | current | CRS WORLD CHARTERS LIMITED |
Status | 1993-10-04 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1987-09-04 | 1993-10-04 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 1985-05-30 | 1987-09-04 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1993-10-04 | Dissolution | |
1985-05-30 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Siian and Pointer Holding Ltd. | 3657 Yonge Street, Toronto, ON M4P 2J6 | 1985-11-08 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Athena Vantage Capital Inc. | 1207-150 Roehampton Avenue, Toronto, ON M4P 0A2 | 2020-11-20 |
10691674 Canada Inc. | 150 Roehampton Avenue, Suite:1401, Toronto, ON M4P 0A2 | 2018-03-20 |
Athena Futures Inc. | 1404-150 Roehampton Avenue, Toronto, ON M4P 0A2 | 2017-02-07 |
Roger Billings Coaching Inc. | 150 Roehampton Avenue, Suite 610, Toronto, ON M4P 0A2 | 2015-10-27 |
Royal Breeze Incorporated | 150 Roehampton Ave, Suite 1204, Toronto, ON M4P 0A2 | 2008-06-20 |
11251830 Canada Inc. | 150 Roehampton Avenue, Suite 1207, Toronto, ON M4P 0A2 | 2019-02-14 |
11894030 Canada Inc. | 150 Roehampton Avenue, Suite 505, Toronto, ON M4P 0A2 | 2020-02-08 |
Deliver Me Pleasure Inc. | 150 Roehampton Ave, Toronto, ON M4P 0A2 | 2020-05-25 |
Adrinam Inc. | 1407 - 212 Eglinton E, Toronto, ON M4P 0A3 | 2020-11-12 |
Ehp Project Controls Management Inc. | 212 Eglinton Avenue East, Suite 307, Toronto, ON M4P 0A3 | 2019-03-05 |
Find all corporations in postal code M4P |
Name | Address |
---|---|
W. THOMAS COOPER | 2651 YONGE, APP. 2A, TORONTO ON M4P 2J6, Canada |
D. KENNITH SAUNDERS | 767A PAPE AVE, TORONTO ON M4K 3T2, Canada |
C.J. MAUREEN RYLEY | 12 HAMMERSMITH, TORONTO ON M4E 2W4, Canada |
City | TORONTO |
Post Code | M4P2J6 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Alex A. Charters Limitee | 1909 Ste. Catherine St West, Montreal, QC H3H 1M3 | 1957-04-02 |
Ambassador World Charters Corp. | 1228 Meadowbrook Dr, Airdrie, AB T4A 1W5 | 1994-08-03 |
Wts Bus Charters Inc. | 7 Mount Edward Road, Charlottetown, PE C1A 5R7 | |
Charters Air Usl Inc. | 135 Commercial Rd, Bolton, ON L0N 1E0 | 1997-12-30 |
3043592 Canada Inc. | 860 Charters Settlement Road, Charters Settlement, NB E3C 1X7 | 1994-06-14 |
Marine Charters Inc. | Cp 22, Ste-anne De Bellevue, QC H9X 3L4 | 1980-08-12 |
Sabair Charters Limited | Box 70, Cochenour, ON P0V 1L0 | 1980-06-16 |
Pjas Charters Company Limited | 129 John Street, Toronto, ON | 1981-07-13 |
Landfall Yacht Charters Limited | 526 Regent Street, Niagara-on-the-lake, ON N0S 1J0 | 1982-02-12 |
World To World Trading Inc. | 4090 Boulevard Industriel, Laval, QC H7L 6V3 | 1997-09-12 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on CRS WORLD CHARTERS LIMITED.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.