LES CONSEILLERS EN SECURITE M.T.M. LIMITEE (Corporation# 192571) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is March 9, 1977.
Corporation ID | 192571 |
Corporation Name |
LES CONSEILLERS EN SECURITE M.T.M. LIMITEE M.T.M. SECURITY CONSULTANTS LIMITED- |
Registered Office Address |
500 Place D'armes Bur 1750 Montreal QC H2Y 2W2 |
Incorporation Date | 1977-03-09 |
Dissolution Date | 1985-06-11 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 7 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
PIERRE TREPANIER | 1435 MONTMARTRE 7, POINTE TREMBLES QC , Canada |
GILLES MITCHELL | 585 RANG DU COTEAU, ST JACQUES QC , Canada |
RICHARD MITCHELL | 720 CARDINAL, ST LAURENT QC , Canada |
ANDRE PRESSEAU | 426 RUE TRUDEAU, LASALLE QC H8R 3C2, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1977-03-09 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1977-03-08 | 1977-03-09 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 1977-03-09 | current | 500 Place D'armes, Bur 1750, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W2 |
Name | 1977-03-09 | current | LES CONSEILLERS EN SECURITE M.T.M. LIMITEE |
Name | 1977-03-09 | current | M.T.M. SECURITY CONSULTANTS LIMITED- |
Status | 1985-06-11 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1977-03-09 | 1985-06-11 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1985-06-11 | Dissolution | |
1977-03-09 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
1984 | 1983-02-15 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
1983 | 1983-02-15 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Les Entreprises Sodag Canada Ltee | 500 Place D'armes, Suite 1980, Montreal, QC | 1979-08-29 |
Ter-o-sno Ltd. | 500 Place D'armes, Suite 1155, Montreal, QC | 1972-03-27 |
Manchester Terminal Inc. | 500 Place D'armes, Suite 2600, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W2 | 1979-12-28 |
Elmgren Gagne Inc. | 500 Place D'armes, Suite 1750, Montreal, QC | 1977-01-31 |
Bruno J. Pateras Holdings Inc. | 500 Place D'armes, Suite 2314, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W2 | 1977-04-22 |
Sime-bro Holdings Ltee | 500 Place D'armes, Suite 1200, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W4 | 1977-07-18 |
85127 Canada Ltd. | 500 Place D'armes, Suite 1200, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W4 | 1977-11-28 |
Video Consultants E.f.p. Inc. | 500 Place D'armes, Suite 1200, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W4 | 1978-02-27 |
Trois-rivieres Stevedoring Ltd. | 500 Place D'armes, Suite 2800, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W2 | 1969-11-21 |
164606 Canada Inc. | 500 Place D'armes, Suite 2095, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W2 | 1988-11-15 |
Find all corporations in the same location |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
La Chambre De Commerce De La Cote De Beaupre | 10516 Boul Sainte-anne, Bur. 3030, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W2 | 1986-06-03 |
Starix Artistic and Musical Entertainment Company Limited | 500 Place D'arme, Suite 2314, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W2 | 1978-06-13 |
Corporation FinanciГ€re Promexim Inc. | 500 Place D'armes, Bur. 2800, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W2 | 1988-11-17 |
Restaurant Chez Georges Montreal Inc. | 500 Place D'armes, Suite 2800, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W2 | 1988-07-29 |
Univers Gestion Multi-voyages Inc. | 500 Place D'armes, Suite 2920, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W2 | 1992-04-22 |
Nor Yergir Inc. | 500 Place D'armes, Bur 1703, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W2 | 1992-04-30 |
Dezert Publicity Inc. | 500 Place D'armes, Bur. 2050, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W2 | 1993-04-29 |
Canadian Forest Exchange Ltd. | 500 Place D'armes, Suite 2830, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W2 | 1996-10-31 |
Neil R. Sutcliffe Management Co. Ltd. | 500 Place D'armes, Suite 2095, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W2 | |
Groupe Consultaxe International LtÉe | 500 Place D'armes, 1703, Montreal, QC H2Y 2W2 | 1996-11-26 |
Find all corporations in postal code H2Y2W2 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
PIERRE TREPANIER | 1435 MONTMARTRE 7, POINTE TREMBLES QC , Canada |
GILLES MITCHELL | 585 RANG DU COTEAU, ST JACQUES QC , Canada |
RICHARD MITCHELL | 720 CARDINAL, ST LAURENT QC , Canada |
ANDRE PRESSEAU | 426 RUE TRUDEAU, LASALLE QC H8R 3C2, Canada |
City | MONTREAL |
Post Code | H2Y2W2 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Security Consultants R. Bedard and Associates Limited | 300 Place D'youville, Suite C-31, Montreal, QC H2Y 2B6 | 1986-10-27 |
Gaz-med Securite Limitee | 784 Des Mille Iles Ouest, Ste-therese, QC | 1975-05-06 |
Consultants En Securite S.n.a. Inc. | 9065 9th Avenue, Montreal, QC H1Z 3A7 | 1997-05-05 |
Les Consultants En Securite & Equipement A.d.a.m. Inc. | 534 Judd, St-eustache, QC | 1984-04-13 |
Les Consultants En Securite P & S Inc. | 13,172 Sunburg Street, Pierrefonds, QC | 1980-09-11 |
A.i.d. Securite Du Canada Limitee | 270 Mclaren St., Ottawa, ON | 1973-04-19 |
Securite Tenox Limitee | 245 Victoria Ave, Suite 220, Westmount, QC H3Z 2M6 | 1979-04-26 |
Securite Renda Limitee | 8155 Rue Durocher, Montreal, QC H3N 2A8 | 1982-02-16 |
Entreprise De Systemes De Securite Lloyd's Limitee | 12 Rue Fabre, Dollard-des-ormeaux, QC H9B 1N9 | 1975-06-03 |
Les Systemes De Securite Renaud Limitee | 997 Decarie Blvd, Suite 201, St.laurent, QC | 1975-03-10 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on LES CONSEILLERS EN SECURITE M.T.M. LIMITEE.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.