TRAINVILLE ENTERPRISES LTD. (Corporation# 179779) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is January 4, 1977.
Corporation ID | 179779 |
Corporation Name | TRAINVILLE ENTERPRISES LTD. |
Registered Office Address |
Place Vertu Shopping Centre St-laurent QC |
Incorporation Date | 1977-01-04 |
Dissolution Date | 1995-10-17 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 2 - 6 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
SYDNEY B SEDEROFF | 5762 FLEET ROAD, HAMPSTEAD QC H3X 1G7, Canada |
ROBERT LAZANIK | 850 COTE ST. LUC ROAD, MONTREAL QC H3W 2H2, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1977-01-04 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1977-01-03 | 1977-01-04 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 1977-01-04 | current | Place Vertu Shopping Centre, St-laurent, QC |
Name | 1977-01-04 | current | TRAINVILLE ENTERPRISES LTD. |
Status | 1995-10-17 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1983-06-03 | 1995-10-17 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 1977-01-04 | 1983-06-03 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1995-10-17 | Dissolution | |
1977-01-04 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Address | PLACE VERTU SHOPPING CENTRE |
City | ST-LAURENT |
Province | QC |
Country | Canada |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
12260972 Canada Inc. | 4231 Garand, St-laurent, QC H4R 2B4 | 2020-08-11 |
Thea Logtech & Blockchain Group Inc. | 2420 Rue De L'acajou, St-laurent, QC H4R 2R9 | 2020-06-08 |
12055554 Canada Inc. | 1165 Rue Montpellier, St-laurent, QC H4L 4R3 | 2020-05-12 |
12040867 Canada Inc. | 10-1685 Grenet, St-laurent, QC H4L 2R6 | 2020-05-05 |
Macroflex Components & Consulting Inc. | 3017b Noorduyn, St-laurent, QC H4R 1A1 | 2020-04-27 |
11970356 Canada Inc. | 501 - 6550 Boul. Henri-bourassa O., St-laurent, QC H7P 6G5 | 2020-03-20 |
Mertex Holdings Inc. | 5838 Cypihot Street, St-laurent, QC H4S 1Y5 | 2020-03-06 |
11724746 Canada Inc. | 2719 Carre Denise Pelletier, St-laurent, QC H4R 2T3 | 2019-11-06 |
11541510 Canada Inc. | 436a Rue Isabey, St-laurent, QC H4T 1V3 | 2019-07-29 |
Cannabis CompГ©tences Inc. | 7526 Henri-bourassa Ouest, St-laurent, QC H4S 2B2 | 2019-05-22 |
Find all corporations in ST-LAURENT |
Name | Address |
---|---|
SYDNEY B SEDEROFF | 5762 FLEET ROAD, HAMPSTEAD QC H3X 1G7, Canada |
ROBERT LAZANIK | 850 COTE ST. LUC ROAD, MONTREAL QC H3W 2H2, Canada |
City | ST-LAURENT |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Enterprises E.a.h. Ltee | 800 Victoria Square, Suite 612, Montreal, QC H4Z 1H6 | 1974-08-30 |
L.a.f. Enterprises Inc. | 3418 Garrard Road, Whitby, ON L1R 2C1 | |
Enterprises Braxo Inc. | 1155 Boul Rene-levesque Ouest, Buearu 2500, Montreal, QC H3B 2K4 | |
Blythe Enterprises Inc. | 1000 Sherbrooke Street West, Suite 1900, MontrГ©al, QC H3A 3G4 | |
Les Enterprises P.g. Mc Cormick Ltee | 3015 Halpern North Street, St. Laurent, QC H4S 1P5 | 1974-07-17 |
Les Enterprises Harlequin Limitee | 225 Duncan Mill Rd, Suite 605, Don Mills, ON M3B 1Z3 | 1949-01-29 |
Oz Enterprises 2013 Limited | 3333 Graham Blvd., Suite 400, Montreal, QC H3R 3L5 | |
Leznoff Enterprises Ltd. | 6535 Waverley Avenue, Montreal, QC H2V 4M2 | 1968-03-20 |
Les Enterprises Dodger Bleue Ltee. | 220 Bay Street, Suite 700, Toronto, ON M5J 2W4 | 1996-03-01 |
Xsite Enterprises of Eastern Ontario Inc. | 131 Senator Street, Carleton Place, ON K7C 3P1 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on TRAINVILLE ENTERPRISES LTD..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.