LAKE BERNARD LAND DEVELOPMENT INC. (Corporation# 1732323) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is July 25, 1984.
Corporation ID | 1732323 |
Business Number | 120428776 |
Corporation Name | LAKE BERNARD LAND DEVELOPMENT INC. |
Registered Office Address |
141 Laurier St. West Ottawa ON K1P 5J3 |
Incorporation Date | 1984-07-25 |
Dissolution Date | 1995-12-11 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 3 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
J. LAHEY | 31 PARKLAND CRS., NEPEAN ON K2H 5V3, Canada |
L. LAHEY | 31 PARKLAND CRS., NEPEAN ON K2H 5V3, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1984-07-25 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1984-07-24 | 1984-07-25 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 1984-07-25 | current | 141 Laurier St. West, Ottawa, ON K1P 5J3 |
Name | 1984-07-25 | current | LAKE BERNARD LAND DEVELOPMENT INC. |
Status | 1995-12-11 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1987-11-02 | 1995-12-11 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 1984-07-25 | 1987-11-02 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1995-12-11 | Dissolution | |
1984-07-25 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Opplink Incorporated | 141 Laurier Avenue, Suite 812, Ottawa, ON K1P 5J3 | 1997-11-18 |
Circle of Friends of The Spanish Language of Canada (c.a.l.e.) | 141 Laurier Ave West, Suite 1000, Ottawa, ON K1P 5J3 | 1997-03-10 |
2991608 Canada Inc. | 141 Laurier Street, Suite 400, Ottawa, ON K1P 5J3 | 1994-01-20 |
Synres Canada Ltd. | 141 Laurier Avenue W., Suite 1000, Ottawa, ON K1P 5J3 | 1993-11-01 |
2905116 Canada Inc. | 141 Laurier O, Suite 400, Ottawa, ON K1P 5J3 | 1993-03-19 |
2798778 Canada Inc. | 141 Laurier Ave W, Suite 400, Ottawa, ON K1P 5J3 | 1992-02-24 |
Reto Marketing Industries Ltd. | 141 Laurier West, Suite 1000, Ottawa, ON K1P 5J3 | 1989-10-03 |
Le 23e Congres International De Laiterie 1990 | 141 Laurier Ave., West, Suite 704, Ottawa, ON K1P 5J3 | 1988-11-30 |
Manoir Haute-chute Inc. | 141 Avenue Laurier Ouest, Suite 310, Ottawa, ON K1P 5J3 | 1988-07-25 |
David E. Leachman Productions Inc. | 141 Laurier Ave. W., 4th Floor, Ottawa, ON K1P 5J3 | 1985-03-12 |
Find all corporations in postal code K1P5J3 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
J. LAHEY | 31 PARKLAND CRS., NEPEAN ON K2H 5V3, Canada |
L. LAHEY | 31 PARKLAND CRS., NEPEAN ON K2H 5V3, Canada |
City | OTTAWA |
Post Code | K1P5J3 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Northtech Land Development Inc. | 1075 Bay Street, Suite 400, Toronto, ON M5S 2B1 | |
Land, Lake & Sky Inc. | Northwest 35-51-08 West of The 3rd Meri, Po Box 492, Shell Lake, SK S0J 2G0 | 2008-03-01 |
Marine Land Recreation Incorporated | Lake Charlotte P.o.box, Lake Charlotte, Co Halifax, NS | 1978-12-07 |
Daughters of The Land | 2611-6th Ave, Cold Lake, AB T9M 2C7 | 2020-02-18 |
Lake Erie Land Gp Inc. | 386 Wilcox Street, Hamilton, ON L8L 8K5 | 2006-02-03 |
Land and Stone Inc. | 116 Boat Lake Road, Wiarton, ON N0H 2T0 | 2005-11-01 |
Northtech Land Development Inc. | 400-1075 Bay Street, Toronto, ON M5S 2B1 | |
Caag Land Development Ltd. | 3365 Highway #7, Brampton, ON L6T 5P4 | |
Farax Land Development Ltd. | 684 Lee Ridge Road, Edmonton, AB | 1978-08-15 |
Lac Ouimet Land Development Inc. | 450 Boul DÉcarie, St-laurent, QC H4L 3K9 | 2001-09-26 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on LAKE BERNARD LAND DEVELOPMENT INC..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.