TAXI TEM INC. (Corporation# 1661817) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is March 5, 1984.
Corporation ID | 1661817 |
Business Number | 125774182 |
Corporation Name | TAXI TEM INC. |
Registered Office Address |
4 Ogima Eagle Village First Nation Kipawa QC J0Z 2H0 |
Incorporation Date | 1984-03-05 |
Dissolution Date | 2015-12-17 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 15 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
Doris Hunter | 29 Amik Crescent, Kipawa QC J0Z 2H0, Canada |
David McLaren | 6 Amik Crescent, Kipawa QC J0Z 2H0, Canada |
Gérald Chaput | 49 Migizy Street, Kipawa QC J0Z 2H0, Canada |
Lance Haymond | 45 Migizy Street, EAGLE VILLAGE FIRST NATION, Kipawa QC J0Z 2H0, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1984-03-05 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1984-03-04 | 1984-03-05 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 2006-01-24 | current | 4 Ogima, Eagle Village First Nation, Kipawa, QC J0Z 2H0 |
Address | 2006-01-23 | 2006-01-24 | P.o.box 756, Eagle Village First Nation, Temicaming, QC J0Z 3R0 |
Address | 2003-07-07 | 2006-01-23 | 40 Ogima, Eagle Village First Nation, Kipawa, QC J0Z 2H0 |
Address | 2001-09-19 | 2003-07-07 | General Delivery, Kipawa, QC J0Z 2H0 |
Address | 1984-03-05 | 2001-09-19 | General Delivery, Kipawa, QC J0Z 2H0 |
Name | 1984-03-05 | current | TAXI TEM INC. |
Status | 2015-12-17 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 2005-07-19 | 2015-12-17 | Active / Actif |
Status | 2005-04-05 | 2005-07-19 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 1999-10-18 | 2005-04-05 | Active / Actif |
Status | 1999-07-09 | 1999-10-18 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 1997-10-17 | 1999-07-09 | Active / Actif |
Status | 1996-07-01 | 1997-10-17 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Dissolution | Section: 210(3) |
1984-03-05 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2015 | 2014-12-04 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2014 | 2013-12-04 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
2013 | 2012-12-04 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Kipawa Fishing Club Ltd. | 7, Ile Aux Corbeaux, Kipawa, QC J0Z 2H0 | 2019-12-11 |
Uavision Inc. | 40, Ogima Street, Kebaowek, QC J0Z 2H0 | 2016-05-25 |
7918623 Canada Inc. | 1040, Chemin Lac Kipawa, Kipawa, QC J0Z 2H0 | 2011-07-15 |
Pourvoiries R.y.m.m. Inc. | 440 Comptoir Postal Kipawa, Chemin De Kipawa, Kipawa, QC J0Z 2H0 | 1985-05-29 |
Les Entreprises Goulet-lÉtourneau Inc. | 7 Rue Principale, Kipawa, QC J0Z 2H0 | 2009-04-15 |
Daniel Goulet Cabinet D'assurances Et Services Financiers Inc. | 7 Rue Principale, Kipawa, QC J0Z 2H0 | 2010-08-03 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
11295276 Canada Inc. | 779, 6ГЁme Rang, Angliers, QC J0Z 1A0 | 2019-03-12 |
4473221 Canada Inc. | 7, Rue Du Cheminot, Angliers, QC J0Z 1A0 | 2008-06-03 |
Distribution Cardinal Inc. | 7, Rue Du Cheminot, Angliers, QC J0Z 1A0 | 2002-08-08 |
Г‰quipements Cardinal Inc. | 7, Rue Cheminot, Angliers, QC J0Z 1A0 | |
Г‰quipements Cardinal Inc. | 7 Rue Du Cheminot, C.p. 40, Angliers, QC J0Z 1A0 | |
Ursa Security Group Canada Inc. | 1148 Ch. B. Voisine, Rouyn-noranda, QC J0Z 1B0 | 2013-03-12 |
Payeur Moto-plus Inc. | 1362 Chemin Du Ruisseau, Rouyn-noranda, QC J0Z 1B0 | 1983-01-26 |
8009112 Canada Inc. | 438 Chemin Lefebvre, Authier-nord, QC J0Z 1E0 | 2011-10-27 |
7744404 Canada Inc. | 60 Rue Albert Ferland, ChГ©nГ©ville, QC J0Z 1E0 | 2011-01-07 |
6281435 Canada Inc. | 60 Rue Albert Ferland, ChГ©nГ©ville, QC J0Z 1E0 | 2004-09-07 |
Find all corporations in postal code J0Z |
Name | Address |
---|---|
Doris Hunter | 29 Amik Crescent, Kipawa QC J0Z 2H0, Canada |
David McLaren | 6 Amik Crescent, Kipawa QC J0Z 2H0, Canada |
Gérald Chaput | 49 Migizy Street, Kipawa QC J0Z 2H0, Canada |
Lance Haymond | 45 Migizy Street, EAGLE VILLAGE FIRST NATION, Kipawa QC J0Z 2H0, Canada |
City | Kipawa |
Post Code | J0Z 2H0 |
Category | taxi |
Category + City | taxi + Kipawa |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Taxi CafГ© Inc. | 495 Wellington Street West, Suite 102, Toronto, ON M5V 1E9 | |
Le Taxi De L'entrepreneur(e) Inc. | 12074 Avenue Savard, MontrÉal-nord, QC H1H 3N2 | 2018-10-01 |
Gsm Taxi Ltd. | 2400 Rue Guenette, St-laurent, QC H4R 2H2 | 1980-07-03 |
Mct Taxi Ltd. | 3100 Brighton, Montreal, QC H3S 1T9 | 1995-04-20 |
Taxi,advertising and Design Holdings Inc. | 495 Wellington Street West, Suite 102, Toronto, ON M5V 1E9 | |
Taxi, Gestion De PublicitÉ Et De Design Inc. | 350 Lemoyne Street, Montreal, QC H2Y 1Y3 | 1992-06-18 |
Taxi Timu & Sons Inc. | 522 Boul Des Laurentides, Laval, QC H7G 2V3 | 1988-04-28 |
Taxi U.S. Holdings Inc. | 495, Wellington Street West, Suite 102, Toronto, ON M5V 1E9 | |
Taxi Gloucester Limitee | 2336 Orient Park Drive, Suite 12, Gloucester, ON K1B 4N5 | 1983-10-04 |
Express Taxi Inc. | 27 Burton, Greenfield Park, QC J4V 2Y6 | 1979-12-06 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on TAXI TEM INC..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.