GESTION MICHEL DION ET FRERES LIMITEE (Corporation# 1581911) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is November 3, 1983.
Corporation ID | 1581911 |
Business Number | 102053360 |
Corporation Name | GESTION MICHEL DION ET FRERES LIMITEE |
Registered Office Address |
280 Boul. St-luc Asbestos QC J1T 2V9 |
Incorporation Date | 1983-11-03 |
Dissolution Date | 2000-03-16 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 9 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
LOUIS-PHILIPPE DION | 272 BOUL. ST-LUC, ASBESTOS QC J1T 2V7, Canada |
ALBAIN DION | 272 BOULEVARD ST-LUC, ASBESTOS QC J1T 2V7, Canada |
CONRAD DION | 333 RUE ST-EDMOND, ASBESTOS QC J1T 2A6, Canada |
ADELARD DION | RR 1, ASBESTOS QC J1T 3M7, Canada |
MICHEL DION | 272 BOULEVARD ST-LUC, ASBESTOS QC J1T 2V7, Canada |
RICHARD DION | 401 5E AVENUE, ASBESTOS QC J1T 1V8, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1983-11-03 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1983-11-02 | 1983-11-03 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 1983-11-03 | current | 280 Boul. St-luc, Asbestos, QC J1T 2V9 |
Name | 1983-11-03 | current | GESTION MICHEL DION ET FRERES LIMITEE |
Status | 2000-03-16 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1983-11-03 | 2000-03-16 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2000-03-16 | Dissolution | Section: 210 |
1983-11-03 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
1998 | 1998-12-16 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
1997 | 1998-12-16 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
1996 | 1998-12-16 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Fromagerie L'oiseau Bleu Inc. | 525, Boul. Industriel, Asbestos, QC J1T 0A4 | 2010-10-04 |
Mombach Technologies Inc. | 351, Rue Des Lilas, Asbestos, QC J1T 0A6 | 2020-04-14 |
Corporation Green River (2001) | 2065 Rue Dickson, Sillery, QC J1T 1C7 | 2001-06-13 |
6169112 Canada IncorporÉe | 240 Rue Manville Ouest, Asbestos, QC J1T 1G7 | 2003-12-08 |
RГ©fractaire Interprovincial Pg Inc. | 240 Rue Manville Ouest, Asbestos, QC J1T 1G7 | 2004-04-06 |
Textiles Decenie Inc. | 280 Rue Manville Ouest, Asbestos, QC J1T 1G9 | 1989-03-10 |
Les Gars De Bois (asbestos) Inc. | 324 Du Roi, Asbestos, QC J1T 1S8 | 1983-11-30 |
Biotechnologie Magma Inc. | 431, 1ere Avenue, Asbestos, QC J1T 1Z3 | 2012-04-05 |
Les Ancrages Martineau & Mongeau Inc. | 334, Rue Lafrance, Asbestos, QC J1T 2L1 | 2016-01-13 |
G. Bernard Coulombe Investments Inc. | 200 Rue Cardinal-leger, Asbestos, QC J1T 2X1 | 1984-09-06 |
Find all corporations in postal code J1T |
Name | Address |
---|---|
LOUIS-PHILIPPE DION | 272 BOUL. ST-LUC, ASBESTOS QC J1T 2V7, Canada |
ALBAIN DION | 272 BOULEVARD ST-LUC, ASBESTOS QC J1T 2V7, Canada |
CONRAD DION | 333 RUE ST-EDMOND, ASBESTOS QC J1T 2A6, Canada |
ADELARD DION | RR 1, ASBESTOS QC J1T 3M7, Canada |
MICHEL DION | 272 BOULEVARD ST-LUC, ASBESTOS QC J1T 2V7, Canada |
RICHARD DION | 401 5E AVENUE, ASBESTOS QC J1T 1V8, Canada |
City | ASBESTOS |
Post Code | J1T2V9 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Gestion De Placements HГ©lГЁne Dion Inc. | 1000, Rue De La GauchetiГЁre Ouest, Bureau 1150 Г Compter Du 2017-11-25, MontrГ©al, QC H3B 4W5 | 2007-05-01 |
Garage Andre Dion Ltee | 875 Rue Michel, Ste-dorothee,laval, QC | 1977-03-22 |
Societe De Gestion Michel Desjardins Limitee | 1868, Chemin Notre-dame Sud, Wentworth-nord, QC J0T 1Y0 | 1985-04-30 |
Gestion Michel St-hilaire Limitee | 1 Parc Samuel Holland, Suite 2340, Quebec, QC G1S 4P2 | 1978-07-18 |
Systemes D'information Michel Dion Inc. | 4172 Place Gamelin, Pierrefonds, QC H9H 4B9 | 1985-02-14 |
Transport Rolland Clermont & Freres Inc. | 945 Ch Rheaume, St-michel, QC J0L 2J0 | 1981-09-24 |
Garage Rene Martin & Freres Inc. | 2100 Rue Principale, St-michel Cte Napierville, QC J0L 2J0 | 1981-07-08 |
Dion Leasing Inc. | 1660 Boul. Industriel, Farnham, QC J2N 2X8 | 1986-03-03 |
Logistique Dion Inc. | 1660 Rue Industriel, Farnham, QC J2N 2X8 | 1998-11-23 |
Dauray Freres & Cie Limitee | 7000 Park Ave, Montreal, QC | 1935-11-02 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on GESTION MICHEL DION ET FRERES LIMITEE.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.