E. S. & A. ROBINSON (CANADIAN HOLDINGS) LIMITED (Corporation# 137545) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is January 25, 1966.
Corporation ID | 137545 |
Corporation Name | E. S. & A. ROBINSON (CANADIAN HOLDINGS) LIMITED |
Registered Office Address |
69 Laird Dr Toronto 17 ON M4G 3T8 |
Incorporation Date | 1966-01-25 |
Dissolution Date | 1982-05-17 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 5 - 5 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
JOHN STANFORD | 11 MILMAR COURT, THORNHILL ON L3T 4J1, Canada |
WILLIAM SEWELL | 4 BALSAM ROAD, TORONTO ON M4E 1P3, Canada |
JOHN WARD | 15 BRYNHURST COURT, TORONTO ON M4P 2J9, Canada |
WILLIAM HUNTER | LOT 7 CONCESSION 8 R.R. #4, UXBRIDGE ON L0G 1K0, Canada |
NORMAN MORRIS | 36 GLENGROVE AVE, TORONTO ON M4R 1N6, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1977-10-21 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1977-10-20 | 1977-10-21 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1966-01-25 | 1977-10-20 |
Canada Corporations Act Part I - Private (CCA - Part I) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes partie I - corporations privГ©es (LCC - Partie I) |
Address | 1966-01-25 | current | 69 Laird Dr, Toronto 17, ON M4G 3T8 |
Name | 1966-01-25 | current | E. S. & A. ROBINSON (CANADIAN HOLDINGS) LIMITED |
Name | 1966-01-25 | current | E. S. ; A. ROBINSON (CANADIAN HOLDINGS) LIMITED |
Status | 1982-05-17 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1977-10-21 | 1982-05-17 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1982-05-17 | Dissolution | |
1977-10-21 | Continuance (Act) / Prorogation (Loi) | |
1966-01-25 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Address | 69 LAIRD DR |
City | TORONTO 17 |
Province | ON |
Postal Code | M4G 3T8 |
Country | Canada |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Les Entreprises Drg Limitee | 85 Laird Drive, Toronto, ON M4G 3T8 | 1932-07-22 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Healthimi Marketing Inc. | 1929 Bayview Avenue, Suite 106, Toronto, ON M4G 0A1 | 2019-08-06 |
Tub International Inc. | 615-20 Burkebrook Pl, Toronto, ON M4G 0A1 | 2019-03-07 |
Green Schools Green Future.org - Gsgf.org | 20 Burkebrook Place, Suite 221, Toronto, ON M4G 0A1 | 2017-11-16 |
Tct Protection Inc. | 615-20 Burkebrook Place, Toronto, ON M4G 0A1 | 2017-09-14 |
10262293 Canada Inc. | 20 Burkebrook Place, Unit 402, Toronto, ON M4G 0A1 | 2017-06-01 |
Temporal Fountain Inc. | #313, 20 Burkebrook Place, Toronto, ON M4G 0A1 | 2017-05-19 |
Gnomeworks Greenhouses Inc. | 610-20 Burkebrook Place, Toronto, ON M4G 0A1 | 2016-01-26 |
Ew Concept Inc. | 20 Burkebrook Place Unit # 615, Toronto, ON M4G 0A1 | 2015-11-02 |
U Weight Loss Aurora Inc. | 409-20 Burkebook Place, East York, ON M4G 0A1 | 2007-07-21 |
Derhan Ltd. | 20 Burkebrook Place, Th7, Toronto, ON M4G 0A1 | 1976-09-07 |
Find all corporations in postal code M4G |
Name | Address |
---|---|
JOHN STANFORD | 11 MILMAR COURT, THORNHILL ON L3T 4J1, Canada |
WILLIAM SEWELL | 4 BALSAM ROAD, TORONTO ON M4E 1P3, Canada |
JOHN WARD | 15 BRYNHURST COURT, TORONTO ON M4P 2J9, Canada |
WILLIAM HUNTER | LOT 7 CONCESSION 8 R.R. #4, UXBRIDGE ON L0G 1K0, Canada |
NORMAN MORRIS | 36 GLENGROVE AVE, TORONTO ON M4R 1N6, Canada |
City | TORONTO 17 |
Post Code | M4G3T8 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Les Gestions D. & G. Robinson Inc. | 253 Biscaye, Dollard Ormeaux, QC H9H 1S2 | 1983-11-01 |
La Compagnie De Gestion M. J. Robinson Inc. | 200 Elgin Street, Suite 700, Ottawa, ON K2P 1L5 | 1985-05-28 |
Assurances Peter Robinson Et Associes Limitee | 145 Wellington West, Toronto, ON M5J 1H8 | |
Niagara Cast Linings Limited | Port Robinson, Port Robinson, ON L0S 1K0 | 1979-11-15 |
Bp Canadian Holdings Limited | First Canadian Place, 57th Floor, Toronto, ON M5X 1G8 | 1957-03-26 |
Dumaine Holdings Inc. | 461 Rue Robinson Sud, Granby, QC J2G 7N3 | 2015-02-27 |
Pinalta 45 Holdings Inc. | 233 Robinson Street, Oakville, ON L6J 1G5 | 2012-09-28 |
G.d. Bradley Holdings Inc. | 233 Robinson Street, Oakville, ON L6J 4Z5 | |
Nesbitt Burns Investment Holdings Limited | 1 First Canadian Place, 21st Floor, Toronto, ON M5X 1A1 | |
Canadian Wings and Aviation Technology Inc. | 81 George Robinson Drive, Brampton, ON L6Y 0G4 | 2019-10-21 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on E. S. & A. ROBINSON (CANADIAN HOLDINGS) LIMITED.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.