GAMCO DISTRIBUTORS (CANADA) LTD. (Corporation# 1322206) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is May 31, 1982.
Corporation ID | 1322206 |
Corporation Name | GAMCO DISTRIBUTORS (CANADA) LTD. |
Registered Office Address |
454 Mccarthy Blvd. North Regina SK S4R 7M2 |
Incorporation Date | 1982-05-31 |
Dissolution Date | 1985-08-31 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 5 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
ALMA GALLANT | 191 MASSEY ROAD, REGINA SK , Canada |
RICHARD STENGLER | 443 MAXWELL CRES., REGINA SK , Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1982-05-31 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1982-05-30 | 1982-05-31 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 1982-05-31 | current | 454 Mccarthy Blvd. North, Regina, SK S4R 7M2 |
Name | 1982-05-31 | current | GAMCO DISTRIBUTORS (CANADA) LTD. |
Status | 1985-08-31 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1984-09-01 | 1985-08-31 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 1982-05-31 | 1984-09-01 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1985-08-31 | Dissolution | |
1982-05-31 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Onacees Business Corporate Limited (obcl) | 1107 8th Avenue North, Regina, SK S4R 0E8 | 2012-11-23 |
Jattwad Transport Ltd. | #20-1816 7th Ave North, Regina, SK S4R 0J2 | 2016-06-09 |
Mokrousoff Welding Inc. | 8-2250 7th Ave N, Regina, SK S4R 0K1 | 2015-03-19 |
11025414 Canada Inc. | 4322 2 Avenue North, Regina, SK S4R 0Y4 | 2018-10-03 |
Cwc Clear Water Clarification Technologies Inc. | 2333 6th Avenue, Regina, SK S4R 1B4 | 2010-09-14 |
Mahalo Whale Ltd. | 401-1916 Dewdney Ave, Regina, SK S4R 1G9 | 2019-07-18 |
Elev8 Wealth Advisors Inc. | 201 - 1916 Dewdney Avenue, Regina, SK S4R 1G9 | 2018-09-24 |
Chabad-lubavitch of Regina Inc. | #401 - 1916 Dewdney Avenue, Regina, SK S4R 1G9 | 2013-07-22 |
Universal English Motors Holding Corporation | 401-1916, Dewdney Avenue, Regina, SK S4R 1G9 | 2011-02-25 |
Leip Mechanical Ltd. | 401-1916 Dewdney Avenue, Willows Wellsch Orr & Brundige LLP, Regina, SK S4R 1G9 | 2006-05-17 |
Find all corporations in postal code S4R |
Name | Address |
---|---|
ALMA GALLANT | 191 MASSEY ROAD, REGINA SK , Canada |
RICHARD STENGLER | 443 MAXWELL CRES., REGINA SK , Canada |
City | REGINA |
Post Code | S4R7M2 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Trican Tire Distributors Inc. | 450 - 1st Street S.w., Suite 2500, Trans Canada Tower, Calgary, AB T2P 5H1 | |
Greensheen Distributors Inc. | 30th Floor - 360 Main Street, Winnipeg, MB R3C 4G1 | |
Mashiva Distributors Inc. | 4308 240 Skyview Ranch Road Ne, Calgary, AB T3N 0P4 | |
Irec Distributors Inc. | 200-8120, 128th Street, Surrey, BC V3W 1R1 | |
B. & W. Huber Distributors, Inc. | Rr 1, Carlsbad Springs, ON K0A 1K0 | 1980-06-23 |
Tradecan Global Distributors Inc. | #200, 8120 - 128th Street, Surrey, BC V3W 1R1 | |
Kcb Bakery and Food Distributors Inc. | 37 Racine Road, Unit 1, Toronto, ON M9W 2Z4 | |
Bedell's (essex) Food Service Distributors Inc. | 199 Bay Street, Suite 5300, Commerce Court West, Toronto, ON M5L 1B9 | |
Bedell's (london) Food Service Distributors Inc. | 199 Bay Street, Suite 5300, Commerce Court West, Toronto, ON M5L 1B9 | |
Csp Distributors Canada Ltd. | 15 Queen Street, Po Box 429, Charlottetown, PE C1A 7K7 | 2008-10-16 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on GAMCO DISTRIBUTORS (CANADA) LTD..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.