NISICHAWAYASIHK EDUCATION AUTHORITY INC. (Corporation# 1313398) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is May 18, 1982.
Corporation ID | 1313398 |
Business Number | 107767311 |
Corporation Name | NISICHAWAYASIHK EDUCATION AUTHORITY INC. |
Registered Office Address |
6 Otetiskiwin Drive West Nelson House MB R0B 1A0 |
Incorporation Date | 1982-05-18 |
Dissolution Date | 2016-04-07 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 3 - 3 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
DARCY LINKLATER JR. | 8 MOORE'S BAY, NELSON HOUSE MB R0B 1A0, Canada |
BONNIE M. SPENCE | 45 HILLSIDE DRIVE, NELSON DRIVE MB R0B 1A0, Canada |
DOLLY M. SPENCE | 18 PICKERAL BAY, NELSON HOUSE MB R0B 1A0, Canada |
JAMES D. MOORE | 1 HART'S POINT ROAD, NELSON HOUSE MB R0B 1A0, Canada |
WANDA BUNN | 13 SPENCE CRESCENT, NELSON HOUSE MB R0B 1A0, Canada |
KIMBERLY LINKLATER-BEARDY | 2 SPENCE STREET, NELSON HOUSE MB R0B 1A0, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 2014-10-06 | current |
Canada Not-for-profit Corporations Act (NFP Act) Loi canadienne sur les organisations Г but non lucratif (Loi BNL) |
Act | 1982-05-18 | 2014-10-06 |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Act | 1982-05-17 | 1982-05-18 |
Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA - Part II) Loi sur les corporations canadiennes - partie II (LCC - Partie II) |
Address | 2014-10-06 | current | 6 Otetiskiwin Drive West, Nelson House, MB R0B 1A0 |
Address | 2007-03-31 | 2014-10-06 | 6 Otetiskiwin Drive West, Nelson House, Manitoba, MB R0B 1A0 |
Address | 2003-03-31 | 2007-03-31 | #2 Otetiskiwin Drive West, Nelson House, Manitoba, MB R0B 1A0 |
Address | 1982-05-18 | 2003-03-31 | P.o.box 598, The Pas, MB R9A 1K6 |
Address | 1982-05-18 | 2003-03-31 | P.o.box 598, The Pas, MB R9A 1K6 |
Name | 2014-10-06 | current | NISICHAWAYASIHK EDUCATION AUTHORITY INC. |
Name | 1982-05-18 | 2014-10-06 | NELSON HOUSE EDUCATION AUTHORITY, INC. |
Status | 2016-04-07 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 2014-10-06 | 2016-04-07 | Active / Actif |
Status | 1982-05-18 | 2014-10-06 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | Dissolution | Section: 220(2) |
2014-10-06 | Continuance (transition) / Prorogation (transition) | Jurisdiction: Canada Corporations Act - Part II (CCA-II) / Loi sur les corporations canadiennes, partie 2 (LCC-Partie 2) |
1982-05-18 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Address | 6 OTETISKIWIN DRIVE WEST |
City | NELSON HOUSE |
Province | MB |
Postal Code | R0B 1A0 |
Country | Canada |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Firstel Operations Inc. | Box 426, Reserve Land, Nelson House, MB R0B 1A0 | 2005-07-15 |
Notigi Guide Training Centre Inc. | Box 429 (aboriginal Land), Nelson House, MB R0B 1A0 | 2004-09-01 |
First Nations Trading Development Corporation | Box 426, Nelson House, MB R0B 1A0 | 2003-06-05 |
Evol Fuel Buyers Inc. | Box 426, Nelson House (aboriginal Corp. O, MB R0B 1A0 | 2004-06-23 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Berens River Harbour Authority | Box 129, Berens River, MB R0B 0A0 | 2003-04-17 |
6980384 Canada Ltd. | Box 61, 326 Channing Dr, Channing, MB R0B 0C0 | 2008-05-22 |
Churchill Beluga Whale Tour Operator Association Inc. | 313 Kelsey Blvd., Churchill, MB R0B 0E0 | 2018-07-17 |
Johacon Engineering Ltd. | 145 La VГ©rendrye Avenue, Churchill, MB R0B 0E0 | 2017-06-08 |
Kid's Arctic Art Incentive Inc. | 15 Henry St. Box 1022, Churchill, MB R0B 0E0 | 2010-12-01 |
Sigmar Ltd. | 13 Hudson Square, Churchill, MB R0B 0E0 | 2004-03-23 |
Hudson Bay Neighbours Regional Roundtable | 180 Laverendrye Street, Churchill, MB R0B 0E0 | 2004-03-22 |
Polar Bear World Inc. | P.o. Box 204, Churchill, MB R0B 0E0 | 2000-04-12 |
Fort Churchill Flying Club | Box 242, Fort Churchill, MB R0B 0E0 | 1967-08-02 |
La Corporation Г‰piscopale Catholique Romaine De La Baie D'hudson | 230 Laverendrye Avenue, Churchill, MB R0B 0E0 | 1938-06-24 |
Find all corporations in postal code R0B |
Name | Address |
---|---|
DARCY LINKLATER JR. | 8 MOORE'S BAY, NELSON HOUSE MB R0B 1A0, Canada |
BONNIE M. SPENCE | 45 HILLSIDE DRIVE, NELSON DRIVE MB R0B 1A0, Canada |
DOLLY M. SPENCE | 18 PICKERAL BAY, NELSON HOUSE MB R0B 1A0, Canada |
JAMES D. MOORE | 1 HART'S POINT ROAD, NELSON HOUSE MB R0B 1A0, Canada |
WANDA BUNN | 13 SPENCE CRESCENT, NELSON HOUSE MB R0B 1A0, Canada |
KIMBERLY LINKLATER-BEARDY | 2 SPENCE STREET, NELSON HOUSE MB R0B 1A0, Canada |
City | NELSON HOUSE |
Post Code | R0B 1A0 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Hishkoonikun Education Authority | 430 Riverside Road, Kashechewan, ON P0L 1S0 | 1990-08-16 |
Mundo Peetabeck Education Authority | 120 Eleanor Circle, Markham, ON L4C 6K7 | 2017-04-04 |
Nova Scotia Mi'kmaq Education Authority | 47 Maillard Street, Membertou, NS B1S 2P5 | 1994-03-28 |
Moose Band Education Authority | 44 Byng Avenue, Willowdale, ON M2N 4K3 | 1984-07-09 |
Kitaskinaw Education Authority Inc. | 10025 - 102a Avenue, #1600, Edmonton, AB T5J 2Z2 | 1993-05-19 |
Peter Ballantyne Cree Nation Education Authority Inc. | 5 - 210 15th Street East, Prince Albert, SK S6V 1G2 | 2008-11-25 |
Moose Cree Education Authority | 25 Pedabun Road, Moose Factory, ON P0L 1W0 | 1992-08-13 |
Attawapiskat First Nation Education Authority | 951 Airport Road, Attawapiskat, ON P0L 1A0 | 1991-11-25 |
Peawanuck Education Authority | P.o. Box:2, Peawanuck, ON P0L 2H0 | 1998-06-16 |
Meadow Lake First Nations Education Authority Inc. | 8003 Flying Dust Reserve, Flying Dust Reserve No. 105, SK S9X 1T8 | 2018-01-14 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on NISICHAWAYASIHK EDUCATION AUTHORITY INC..
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.