Candle Lake Chamber of Commerce (Corporation# 12921) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is September 17, 1984.
Corporation ID | 12921 |
Corporation Name | Candle Lake Chamber of Commerce |
Registered Office Address |
- P.o. Box: 220 Candle Lake SK S0J 3E0 |
Incorporation Date | 1984-09-17 |
Corporation Status | Active / Actif |
Number of Directors | 30 - 30 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
Suzanne Peters | BOX 250, Candle Lake SK S0J 3E0, Canada |
Helen Kozun | 1 Fairway Drive , Box 118, Candle Lake SK S0J 3E0, Canada |
Jennifer Tucker | BOX 136, Candle Lake SK S0J 3E0, Canada |
MICHELLE LOZEJ | -, BOX 116, CANDLE LAKE SK S0J 3E0, Canada |
Daniel Odgers | BOX 19, Candle Lake SK S0J 3E0, Canada |
Linnea Ericksun | BOX 230, Candle Lake SK S0J 3E0, Canada |
Jami Sumlic | BOX 101, Candle Lake SK S0J 3E0, Canada |
Wally Lever Ton | BOX 36, Candle Lake SK S0J 3E0, Canada |
Amy Smith | Box 432, Candle Lake SK S0J 3E0, Canada |
Bev Huziek | 200 k place, Candle Lake SK S0J 3E0, Canada |
Wayne Tucker | BOX 136, Candle Lake SK S0J 3E0, Canada |
CATHY SMITH | -, BOX 414, CANDLE LAKE SK S0J 3E0, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1984-09-17 | current |
Boards of Trade Act - Part II (BOTA - Part II) Loi sur les chambres de commerce - partie II (LCH - Partie II) |
Act | 1984-09-16 | 1984-09-17 |
Boards of Trade Act - Part II (BOTA - Part II) Loi sur les chambres de commerce - partie II (LCH - Partie II) |
Address | 2019-05-29 | current | -, P.o. Box: 220, Candle Lake, SK S0J 3E0 |
Address | 2017-03-31 | 2019-05-29 | P.o. Box: 220, Candle Lake, SK S0J 3E0 |
Address | 2016-03-31 | 2017-03-31 | P.o. Box: 68, Candle Lake, SK S0J 3E0 |
Address | 2014-03-31 | 2016-03-31 | Po Box 68, Candle Lake, SK S0J 3E0 |
Address | 2013-03-31 | 2014-03-31 | Po Box 6, Candle Lake, SK S0J 3E0 |
Address | 2003-03-31 | 2013-03-31 | Po Box 68, Candle Lake, SK S0J 3E0 |
Address | 2001-03-31 | 2003-03-31 | Box 100, Candle Lake, SK S0J 3E0 |
Address | 2000-03-31 | 2001-03-31 | Box 100, Candle Lake, SK S0J 3E2 |
Address | 1984-09-17 | 2000-03-31 | Box 100, Candle Lake, SK S0J 3E2 |
Name | 1984-09-17 | current | Candle Lake Chamber of Commerce |
Status | 1984-09-17 | current | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1984-09-17 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
2019 | 2019-03-03 | |
2018 | 2018-03-26 | |
2017 | 2017-03-31 |
Address | - |
City | CANDLE LAKE |
Province | SK |
Postal Code | S0J 3E0 |
Country | Canada |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Beaver Valley Chamber of Commerce of Thornbury and District | -, P.o. Box: 477, Thornbury, ON N0H 2P0 | 1965-04-23 |
Creston Valley Chamber of Commerce | -, P.o. Box:268, Creston, BC V0B 1G0 | 1935-04-05 |
Marathon and District Chamber of Commerce | -, P.o. Box: 988, Marathon, ON P0T 2E0 | 1963-01-31 |
New Liskeard Chamber of Commerce | -, P.o. Box: 811, New Liskeard, ON P0J 1P0 | 1903-07-20 |
Norwich Board of Trade | -, P.o. Box:1028, Norwich, ON N0J 1P0 | 1911-02-27 |
Salmo District Chamber of Commerce | -, Box 400, Salmo, BC V0G 1Z0 | 1937-08-11 |
Slocan District Chamber of Commerce | -, P.o. Box: 448, New Denver, BC V0G 1S0 | 1912-09-14 |
Waskesiu Chamber of Commerce | -, P.o. Box: 216, Waskesiu Lake, SK S0J 2Y0 | 1959-11-11 |
North Shuswap Chamber of Commerce | -, P.o. Box: 24011, Scotch Creek, BC V0E 3L0 | 1998-02-02 |
Paris and District Chamber of Commerce | -, P.o. Box: 130, Paris, ON N3L 3E7 | 1999-02-23 |
Find all corporations in the same location |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Kolisnek Charity Group Inc. | 2 Marina Drive, Candle Lake, SK S0J 3E0 | 2011-07-29 |
Membrane Structures Manufacturers Association Inc. | 5 Aspen Ridge Road, Box 376, Candle Lake, SK S0J 3E0 | 2004-02-17 |
Name | Address |
---|---|
Suzanne Peters | BOX 250, Candle Lake SK S0J 3E0, Canada |
Helen Kozun | 1 Fairway Drive , Box 118, Candle Lake SK S0J 3E0, Canada |
Jennifer Tucker | BOX 136, Candle Lake SK S0J 3E0, Canada |
MICHELLE LOZEJ | -, BOX 116, CANDLE LAKE SK S0J 3E0, Canada |
Daniel Odgers | BOX 19, Candle Lake SK S0J 3E0, Canada |
Linnea Ericksun | BOX 230, Candle Lake SK S0J 3E0, Canada |
Jami Sumlic | BOX 101, Candle Lake SK S0J 3E0, Canada |
Wally Lever Ton | BOX 36, Candle Lake SK S0J 3E0, Canada |
Amy Smith | Box 432, Candle Lake SK S0J 3E0, Canada |
Bev Huziek | 200 k place, Candle Lake SK S0J 3E0, Canada |
Wayne Tucker | BOX 136, Candle Lake SK S0J 3E0, Canada |
CATHY SMITH | -, BOX 414, CANDLE LAKE SK S0J 3E0, Canada |
City | CANDLE LAKE |
Post Code | S0J 3E0 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Elk Lake and District Chamber of Commerce | Elk Lake, ON P0J 1G0 | 1910-09-19 |
Red Lake District Chamber of Commerce | Box 430, Red Lake, ON P0V 2M0 | 1953-05-02 |
Cowichan Lake District Chamber of Commerce | 125c South Shore Road, P.o. Box: 824, Lake Cowichan, BC V0R 2G0 | 1946-12-11 |
Deer Lake Chamber of Commerce | 44 Trans Canada Highway, Suite 3 P.o. Box: 5669, Deer Lake, NL A8A 2E4 | 1982-12-07 |
Williams Lake & District Chamber of Commerce | 1660 South Broadway, Williams Lake, BC V2G 2W4 | 1949-10-11 |
Kootenay Lake Chamber of Commerce | Box 120, Crawford Bay, BC V0B 1E0 | 1983-08-08 |
Christina Lake Chamber of Commerce | Highway #3 and Kimura Rd, Christina Lake, BC V0H 1E3 | 1996-03-12 |
Kirkland Lake District Chamber of Commerce | 23 Government Rd. East, P.o. Box: 966, Kirkland Lake, ON P2N 3L1 | 1960-08-08 |
North Frontenac Chamber of Commerce | Sharbot Lake, ON | 1973-04-04 |
Mistissini Lake Chamber of Commerce | Mistassini, QC G0W 1C0 | 1991-03-25 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on Candle Lake Chamber of Commerce.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.