MARGURN SAILING LIMITED (Corporation# 1279343) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is March 15, 1982.
Corporation ID | 1279343 |
Business Number | 881470751 |
Corporation Name | MARGURN SAILING LIMITED |
Registered Office Address |
27 Peter Street North Orillia ON L3V 6J8 |
Incorporation Date | 1982-03-15 |
Dissolution Date | 1996-03-26 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 2 - 2 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
M.C. TRITES | BAY PARK, R.R. 3, ORILLIA ON , Canada |
G.L. TRITES | BAY PARK, R.R. 3, ORILLIA ON , Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1982-03-15 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1982-03-14 | 1982-03-15 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 1982-03-15 | current | 27 Peter Street North, Orillia, ON L3V 6J8 |
Name | 1982-03-15 | current | MARGURN SAILING LIMITED |
Status | 1996-03-26 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1989-07-01 | 1996-03-26 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 1982-03-15 | 1989-07-01 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1996-03-26 | Dissolution | |
1982-03-15 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
1987 | 1986-12-22 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
8997527 Canada Inc. | 3041 Emperor Drive, Orillia, ON L3V 0A4 | 2014-08-23 |
Gestion Gilles Fournier Et Associes Inc. | 3037 Emperor Drive, Orillia, ON L3V 0A4 | 2003-06-30 |
9099891 Canada Inc. | 3041 Emperor Drive, Orillia, ON L3V 0A4 | 2014-11-26 |
8272395 Canada Inc. | 19 Pearl Drive, Orillia, ON L3V 0A5 | 2012-08-13 |
Canada Chen Li International Technology and Science Inc. | 82 Pearl Drive, Orillia, ON L3V 0A6 | 2017-06-13 |
Stoll North America Inc. | 75 Pearl Drive, Orillia, ON L3V 0A6 | 2004-03-03 |
Ucmdev Inc. | 99 Pearl Drive, Orillia, ON L3V 0A7 | 2018-04-28 |
12449391 Canada Inc. | 2075 Elana Drive, Severn, ON L3V 0C1 | 2020-10-27 |
9324925 Canada Inc. | 2147 Elana Drive, Orillia, ON L3V 0C1 | 2015-06-08 |
Wyn Properties Ltd. | Taylor Dr, Orillia, ON L3V 0C7 | 2020-01-17 |
Find all corporations in postal code L3V |
Name | Address |
---|---|
M.C. TRITES | BAY PARK, R.R. 3, ORILLIA ON , Canada |
G.L. TRITES | BAY PARK, R.R. 3, ORILLIA ON , Canada |
City | ORILLIA |
Post Code | L3V6J8 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Big O Sailing Limited | 629 Guelph Street, Kitchener, ON N2H 5Y5 | 2017-04-18 |
Venture Sailing School Limited | 53 Yonge Street, Kingston, ON K7M 1E4 | 1980-12-15 |
Surf-sailing Canada Limited | 9 Davies Avenue, 3rd Floor, Toronto, ON M4M 2A6 | 1977-05-04 |
Ottawa Performance Sailing Limited | 2206 Sixth Line Road, Dunrobin, ON K0A 1T0 | 2009-10-25 |
Smooth Sailing Naval Architecture Consulting Limited | 57-246 John Garland Blvd., Toronto, ON M9V 1N8 | 2011-08-12 |
Vagabond Sailing Inc. | 322 - 233 Fourth Avenue, Sudbury, ON P3B 4C3 | 2005-03-30 |
Aardvark Sailing Inc. | 333 Kenilworth Avenue, Toronto, ON M4L 3S9 | 2019-10-29 |
Sailing Education Consulting Inc. | 1 Coldstream Ave., Toronto, ON M5N 1X5 | 2013-08-06 |
Sky Sailing Studios Ltd. | 126 Holder Road, Rr 3, Lunenburg, NS B0J 2C0 | 2017-11-12 |
Sailing for Gold Association | 11b Alberta Ave, Swalwell, AB T0M 1Y0 | 1998-05-11 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on MARGURN SAILING LIMITED.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.