GESTION RICHARD FORTIER LTEE (Corporation# 1038885) is a federal corporation entity registered with Corporations Canada. The incorporation date is November 17, 1980.
Corporation ID | 1038885 |
Corporation Name | GESTION RICHARD FORTIER LTEE |
Registered Office Address |
791 Boulevard Laure Sept-iles QC G4R 1Y2 |
Incorporation Date | 1980-11-17 |
Dissolution Date | 1996-01-03 |
Corporation Status | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Number of Directors | 1 - 5 |
Director Name | Director Address |
---|---|
FORTIER RICHARD | 106 RUE OTTER APT 9, SEPT ILES QC G4R 4M2, Canada |
Type | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Detail |
---|---|---|---|
Act | 1980-11-17 | current |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Act | 1980-11-16 | 1980-11-17 |
Canada Business Corporations Act (CBCA) Loi canadienne sur les sociГ©tГ©s par actions (LCSA) |
Address | 1980-11-17 | current | 791 Boulevard Laure, Sept-iles, QC G4R 1Y2 |
Name | 1980-11-17 | current | GESTION RICHARD FORTIER LTEE |
Status | 1996-01-03 | current | Dissolved / Dissoute |
Status | 1988-03-05 | 1996-01-03 | Active - Dissolution Pending (Non-compliance) / Actif - Dissolution en cours (Non-conformitГ©) |
Status | 1980-11-17 | 1988-03-05 | Active / Actif |
Date | Activity | Details |
---|---|---|
1996-01-03 | Dissolution | |
1980-11-17 | Incorporation / Constitution en sociГ©tГ© |
Year | Annual Meeting Date | Corporation Type |
---|---|---|
1985 | 1981-01-27 | Non-distributing corporation with 50 or fewer shareholders SociГ©tГ© n'ayant pas appel au public et comptant 50 actionnaires ou moins |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
2976081 Canada Inc. | 737 Laure, Bur 201, Sept-iles, QC G4R 1Y2 | 1993-11-25 |
2928035 Canada Inc. | 737 Boul Laure, Bur 201, Sept Iles, QC G4R 1Y2 | 1993-06-09 |
Location D'automobiles De Fermont Inc. | 770 Blvd Laure, Sept Iles, QC G4R 1Y2 | 1980-07-22 |
Maloney, Lalonde, Girouard, Letendre & Associes Ltee | 737 Boul. Laure, Bur. 201, Sept-iles, QC G4R 1Y2 | 1978-10-12 |
Labrie, Langis Location D'automobile Inc. | 770 Boulevard Laure, Sept-iles, QC G4R 1Y2 | 1980-11-04 |
Eddy Maloney & Associes, Experts-conseils Ltee | 737 Boul. Laure, Bur 201, Sept-iles, QC G4R 1Y2 | 1986-06-02 |
3078558 Canada Inc. | 737 Laure, Bur 201, Sept Iles, QC G4R 1Y2 | 1994-10-19 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
10529478 Canada Inc. | 22, Rue Des Marais, Sept-ГЋles, QC G4R 0C2 | 2017-12-07 |
Transport De Gravier Daniel Fournier Ltee | 94, Rue Saint-jean, RiviГЁre-du-loup, QC G4R 0C2 | 1979-02-05 |
Synase Corporation | 662 De La Rive, Sept-iles, QC G4R 0C8 | 2005-02-14 |
119028 Canada Inc. | 30, Rue Holliday, Sept-iles, QC G4R 0G9 | |
146157 Canada Inc. | 997, Rue De La Rive, Sept Iles, QC G4R 0L4 | 1985-06-14 |
Gestion Lionel Bouchard Inc. | 18 Bourdages, Sept Iles, QC G4R 1A8 | 1980-07-07 |
Immeubles Michel Robichaud Inc. | 97 Rue Holliday, Sept-iles, QC G4R 1E9 | 1979-08-09 |
Vitrerie Norcristal (1982) Inc. | 360 Perreault, Sept-iles, QC G4R 1K3 | 1982-03-16 |
7178468 Canada Inc. | 454, Avenue Perreault, Sept-ГЋles, QC G4R 1K5 | 2009-06-01 |
6976182 Canada Inc. | 454 Rue Perreault, Sept-ГЋles, QC G4R 1K5 | 2008-05-14 |
Find all corporations in postal code G4R |
Name | Address |
---|---|
FORTIER RICHARD | 106 RUE OTTER APT 9, SEPT ILES QC G4R 4M2, Canada |
City | SEPT-ILES |
Post Code | G4R1Y2 |
Corporation Name | Office Address | Incorporation |
---|---|---|
Gestion Jean-guy Duquette Ltee | 1605 Rue Fortier, App. 2, St-bruno, QC J3V 6G7 | 1977-05-26 |
Fortier Insurance Agencies Ltd. | 260 Est, Boul. Henri Bourassa, Montreal, QC H3L 1B8 | 1975-10-30 |
Compagnie Generale De Gestion Immobiliere (c.g.g.i.) Ltee | 9 Rue Fortier, Pierrefonds, QC H8Y 1A7 | 1979-03-07 |
Gestion Roger Fortier Ltee | 365 Rue Saint-desire, Black Lake, QC | 1977-09-14 |
Compagnie De Gestion Andre Blanchard Ltee | 750 Place Fortier, St-laurent, QC H4L 5C1 | 1978-01-26 |
Richard Laroche Consultant Inc. | 740 Place Fortier, App. 1009, St-laurent, ON H4L 5A9 | 1990-11-08 |
Stinson Fortier Ltd. | 800 Place Victoria, Bureau 720 C.p. 214, Montreal, QC H4Z 1E4 | 1946-06-27 |
Les Assurances Richard Lefebvre Inc. (agent General) | 4028 Ernest Fortier, Cap Rouge, Quebec, QC G1Y 1G7 | 1987-06-08 |
Gestion Richard Johnson Ltee | 164 Rue Dufferin, Hampstead, QC | 1980-09-30 |
Gestion Richard Denis Ltee | 27 Rue Des Chutes, Coteau-du-lac, QC J0P 1B0 | 1976-05-21 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on GESTION RICHARD FORTIER LTEE.
Data Provider | Corporations Canada |
Jurisdiction | Canada |
This dataset includes 999 thousand corporation entities registered with Corporations Canada, a division of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada. Each corporation is registered with corporation number, corporate name, office address, current status, directors, annual filling dates, etc.